This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2020 at 06:26:16 (UTC).

Patricia McCarthy v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Patricia McCarthy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01910

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia McCarthy

Defendants

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David N Barry

Attorney at Barry Law Firm

11845 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Benson Yeager Douglas

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Benjamin Patrick Tarczy

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1166

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01910 CJC (SHKx). (car) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:20-cv-01910-JGB-SHKx. (car) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Patricia McCarthy. (Tarczy, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Tarczy, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #2

Answer

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC2002619 Receipt No: ACACDC-28075662 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer) (Attorney Benjamin Patrick Tarczy added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Tarczy, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01910 CJC (SHKx). (car) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:20-cv-01910-JGB-SHKx. (car) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Filed in State Court on 9/14/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Patricia McCarthy. Filed in State Court on 7/10/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Patricia McCarthy. (Tarczy, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Tarczy, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC2002619 Receipt No: ACACDC-28075662 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer) (Attorney Benjamin Patrick Tarczy added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Tarczy, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less