This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 07:53:14 (UTC).

Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC et al v. Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Intrepid U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06552

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC

Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC

Defendant

Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher J. Clark

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (NY)

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Lauren Jill Pincus

Attorney at Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP

111 Broadway

New York, NY 10006

David Adam Berger

Attorney at Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Sean Henry McMahon

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 3Rd Ave

New York, NY 10022

Robert Henry Hotz, Jr

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Nicholas Lloyd McQuaid

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 7, 2020., #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Redacted. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

20 #1

Exhibit 1

#20

(#20) DECLARATION of Lauren J. Pincus in Support re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Berger, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#19

(#19) LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 7, 2020. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

18 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint

18 #1

Exhibit 1 - Bankruptcy Hearing Transcript dated August 4, 2020

#18

(#18) DECLARATION of Sean H. McMahon in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bankruptcy Hearing Transcript dated August 4, 2020, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Zohar Adversary Proceeding Complaint [FILED UNDER SEAL]).(McMahon, Sean) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal (with Exhibits), Statement of Relatedness, Civil Cover Sheet, Docket Sheet, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, and Local Rules for the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York served on Plaintiffs Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC and Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC on August 17, 2020. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05540. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Christopher) Modified on 8/18/2020 (dnh). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Transcript dated August 4, 2020

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Bankruptcy Court Order

1 #1

Exhibit 1- State Court Filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652919/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21191048).Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit 2- Bankruptcy Court Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Transcript dated August 4, 2020).(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 7, 2020., #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Filed under seal. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #19 .(Berger, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 7, 2020., #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Redacted. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DECLARATION of Lauren J. Pincus in Support re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Berger, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) LETTER MOTION to Seal /File a redacted version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Remand addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from David A. Berger dated October 7, 2020. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Sean H. McMahon in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bankruptcy Hearing Transcript dated August 4, 2020, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Zohar Adversary Proceeding Complaint [FILED UNDER SEAL]).(McMahon, Sean) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc., Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Zohar Adversary Proceeding Complaint)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christopher J. Clark dated September 30, 2020. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Henry McMahon on behalf of Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(McMahon, Sean) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Berger, David) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal (with Exhibits), Statement of Relatedness, Civil Cover Sheet, Docket Sheet, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, and Local Rules for the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York served on Plaintiffs Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC and Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC on August 17, 2020. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Intrepid U.S.A., Inc...(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as possibly related to 1:20-cv-05540-UA (Currently Unassigned pending Judge Carter's acceptance of related case 1:20-cv-05528-ALC). (dnh) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher J. Clark. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code omitted; Dollar Demand 3,414,221,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:157; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $3,414,000. (dnh) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05540. Document filed by Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC..(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Christopher) Modified on 8/18/2020 (dnh). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652919/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21191048).Document filed by Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit 2- Bankruptcy Court Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Transcript dated August 4, 2020).(Clark, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less