This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2020 at 10:11:39 (UTC).

Patino-Garcia v Loera, et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Patino-Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Loera. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Andrew P. Gordon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00891

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paula Patino-Garcia

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendants

Bertha Zepeda Loera

FD Nevada, LLC, d/b/a Famous Daves

FD Nevada, LLC doing business as Famous Dave's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael C. Kane

Attorney at THE702FIRM

400 S. 7Th Street Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Bradley J. Myers

Attorney at THE702FIRM

400 South Seventh Street, 4Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell Resnick

Attorney at Resnick and Louis

8111 E Indian Bend Rd.

Scottsdale, AZ 85250

Troy Clark

Attorney at Resnick & Lewis, P.C.

8925 West Russell Road Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the case is remanded to the state court from which it was removed for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Certified Copy of Order and Docket Sheet Sent to State Court - JQC) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit Nevada SOS

#12

(#12) REPLY to #10 Reply by Defendants FD Nevada, LLC, Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nevada SOS) (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) ERROR: Document is a duplicate of #12 and is therefore terminated. REPLY to #6 Order to Show Cause by Defendants FD Nevada, LLC, Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Resnick, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#9

(#9) SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED the defendants to show cause, in writing, why this action should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to show cause by 7/2/2020 will result in remand to the state court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

8 #7

Exhibit Nevada SOS

8 #6

Exhibit Demand

8 #5

Exhibit Demand for Jury Trial

8 #4

Exhibit IAFD

8 #3

Exhibit Answer

8 #2

Exhibit Summons

8 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#8

(#8) Supplemental AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-809834-C, by FD Nevada, LLC, Bertha Zepeda Loera. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit IAFD, #5 Exhibit Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Exhibit Demand, #7 Exhibit Nevada SOS) (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Paula Patino-Garcia. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kane, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/22/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/6/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the case is remanded to the state court from which it was removed for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Certified Copy of Order and Docket Sheet Sent to State Court - JQC) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #10 Reply : ERROR: Attorney Mitchell Resnick was advised that the document was not in compliance with LR IC 5-1(b) and was advised that no further action was required but refiled the document again resulting in a duplicate filing. Document #10 is terminated as a duplicate entry. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to #10 Reply by Defendants FD Nevada, LLC, Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nevada SOS) (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #10 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ERROR: Document is a duplicate of #12 and is therefore terminated. REPLY to #6 Order to Show Cause by Defendants FD Nevada, LLC, Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Resnick, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED the defendants to show cause, in writing, why this action should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to show cause by 7/2/2020 will result in remand to the state court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Supplemental AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-809834-C, by FD Nevada, LLC, Bertha Zepeda Loera. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit IAFD, #5 Exhibit Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Exhibit Demand, #7 Exhibit Nevada SOS) (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Paula Patino-Garcia. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kane, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/22/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/6/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants FD Nevada, LLC, d/b/a Famous Daves, Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by FD Nevada, LLC, d/b/a Famous Daves, Bertha Zepeda Loera. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-809834-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6015615) by FD Nevada, LLC, d/b/a Famous Daves, Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Administratively Terminated. Initiating documents not filed. (EDS) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley J. Myers