This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 10:57:50 (UTC).

Patel v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Patel filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00859

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Radhe PATEL

Defendants

ur JADDOU

Alissa EMMEL

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Niralkumar Patel

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/08/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2023) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/08/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2023) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2023) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Radhe Patel.. (Patel, Niralkumar) (Filed on 3/4/2023) (Entered: 03/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Cover Sheet by Radhe Patel . (Patel, Niralkumar) (Filed on 3/4/2023) (Entered: 03/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. The civil cover sheet is not signed. Re:[1-2] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Radhe Patel. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Parties' names or part of parties' names should not be entered in all capital letters. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Radhe Patel. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Alissa Emmel, Ur Jaddou and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Radhe PATEL re #1 Complaint (Patel, Niralkumar) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Patel, Niralkumar) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18021205.). Filed byRadhe PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patel, Niralkumar) (Filed on 2/24/2023) Modified on 2/27/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less