This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2022 at 08:21:17 (UTC).

Patel v. Metromile, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 Patel filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Metromile, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna M. Ryu and Susan Illston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-10068

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donna M. Ryu

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hitesh Patel

Defendants

Metromile, Inc.

Dan Preston

Colin Bryant

John Butler

David Friedberg

Sandra Clarke

Ryan Graves

Vikas Singhal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan Jason Smith

Attorney at Brodsky & Smith LLC

9595 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 900

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Hitesh Patel (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Colin Bryant, John Butler, Sandra Clarke, David Friedberg, Ryan Graves, Metromile, Inc., Dan Preston, Vikas Singhal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hitesh Patel. Colin Bryant served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; John Butler served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Sandra Clarke served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; David Friedberg served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Ryan Graves served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Metromile, Inc. served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Dan Preston served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Vikas Singhal served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/28/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hitesh Patel.. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/17/2022) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hitesh Patel (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hitesh Patel (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2022 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hitesh Patel.. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/17/2022) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/28/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hitesh Patel. Colin Bryant served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; John Butler served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Sandra Clarke served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; David Friedberg served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Ryan Graves served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Metromile, Inc. served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Dan Preston served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Vikas Singhal served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Colin Bryant, John Butler, Sandra Clarke, David Friedberg, Ryan Graves, Metromile, Inc., Dan Preston, Vikas Singhal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Hitesh Patel (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Colin Bryant, John Butler, Sandra Clarke, David Friedberg, Ryan Graves, Metromile, Inc., Dan Preston, Vikas Singhal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16759826.). Filed byHitesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROMILE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Jason Smith