This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2021 at 11:55:03 (UTC).

Patel v. Marriott Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Patel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Marriott Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Susie Morgan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03329

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Susie Morgan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chirag Patel

Harvey, LA 70058

Defendants

Marriott International, Inc.

John G Alsobrook

Unidentified Parties

Sunstone Hotel Investors

Gumbo Alley, LLC

Staff Pro, LLC

Olivier Lau

Marriott Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott T Winstead

Attorney at Ron Austin & Associates

400 Manhattan Boulevard, Ste 2105

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ron Anthony Austin

Attorney at Ron Austin Law

400 Manhattan Blvd

Harvey, LA 70058

Defendant Attorneys

John Gleason Alsobrook

Attorney at Ostendorf, Tate, Barnett, LLP

650 Poydras St., Suite 1460

New Orleans, LA 70130

Joseph Francis Schrempp

Attorney at Ostendorf Tate Barnett, LLP

650 Poydras Street, Suite #1460

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lance Stephen Ostendorf

Attorney at Ostendorf, Tate, Barnett, LLP

650 Poydras St., Suite 1460

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, #8 Amended Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Marriott International, Inc., Gumbo Alley, LLC, Olivier Lau.(Alsobrook, John) Modified text, added filer and link on 1/12/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

9 #4

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

9 #3

Proposed Order

9 #2

Exhibit

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand by Chirag Patel. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Winstead, Scott) Modified text on 1/12/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#8

(#8) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, LA, case number 2020-07737, F-7 filed by Olivier Lau, Marriott International, Inc., Gumbo Alley, LLC.(sbs) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/4/2021. (sbs) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

6 #2

Proposed Pleading

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal by Gumbo Alley, LLC, Olivier Lau, Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Alsobrook, John) Modified text on 12/31/2020 (pp). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

5 #2

State Service of Process Returns

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Affidavit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, LA, case number 2020-07737, F-7 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8628788) filed by Marriott International, Inc., Gumbo Alley, LLC, and Olivier Lau (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney John Gleason Alsobrook added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft).(Alsobrook, John) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/7/2020) (lt). Modified text on 12/7/2020 (lt). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, #8 Amended Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Marriott International, Inc., Gumbo Alley, LLC, Olivier Lau.(Alsobrook, John) Modified text, added filer and link on 1/12/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand by Chirag Patel. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Winstead, Scott) Modified text on 1/12/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, LA, case number 2020-07737, F-7 filed by Olivier Lau, Marriott International, Inc., Gumbo Alley, LLC.(sbs) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/4/2021. (sbs) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal by Gumbo Alley, LLC, Olivier Lau, Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Alsobrook, John) Modified text on 12/31/2020 (pp). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Compliance by Gumbo Alley, LLC, Olivier Lau, Marriott International, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Service of Process Returns)(Alsobrook, John) Modified text and link on 12/22/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants amend their notice of removal to properly allege the citizenship of Gumbo Alley, LLC and Staff Pro, LLC by no later than Wednesday, December 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/15/2020.(sbs) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gumbo Alley, LLC, Olivier Lau, Marriott International, Inc. (lt) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, LA, case number 2020-07737, F-7 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8628788) filed by Marriott International, Inc., Gumbo Alley, LLC, and Olivier Lau (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney John Gleason Alsobrook added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft).(Alsobrook, John) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/7/2020) (lt). Modified text on 12/7/2020 (lt). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Staff Pro LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sunstone Hotel Investors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MARRIOTT is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant