This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:46:46

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Patel against Brennan in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-CV-03331
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Civil Right - Employment Discrimination
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Robert M. Dow, Jr
  • Courthouse Illinois Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Megan J. Brennan
  • Represented By
    • AUSA - Chicago
  • Plaintiff Smita A Patel
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant United States Postal Service
  • Represented By
    • AUSA - Chicago

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smita A Patel as to Megan ...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in t...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Smita A Patel (rp, ) (En...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (rp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Smita A Patel; Jury Demand. (Exhibit...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smita A Patel as to Megan J. Brennan on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Attachments). (gcy, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
  • 05/30/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Megan J. Brennan (jn, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
  • 05/23/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/31/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Smita A Patel (rp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (rp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Smita A Patel; Jury Demand. (Exhibits)(rp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.