This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 07:29:23 (UTC).

PATEL v. BARR et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 PATEL filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against BARR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. BARCLAY SURRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03856

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. BARCLAY SURRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEVANG PATEL

Defendants

ATTORNEY GENERAL WILLIAM P. BARR

ACTING DIRECTOR CHAD F. WOLF

CHAIRMAN DAVID H. WETMORE

Director JAMES MCHENRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REBECCA HUFSTADER

Attorney at NATIONALITIES SERVICE CENTER

1216 Arch St 4Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19107

JONAH EATON

Attorney at NATIONALITIES SERVICE CENTER

1216 Arch St

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant Attorneys

VIVECA D PARKER

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

VERONICA JANE FINKELSTEIN

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEYS OFFICE EDPA

615 Chestnut St Ste 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

#26

RESTRICTED

#25

RESTRICTED

#24

RESTRICTED

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's August 13, 2020 Order filed by DEVANG PATEL. (HUFSTADER, REBECCA) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: U.S. Marshal Service served Summons and Complaint upon WILLIAM P. BARR by FedEx on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (mbh, ) Modified on 10/2/2020 (fb). Modified on 10/2/2020 (mbh, ). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's August 13, 2020 Order filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, JAMES MCHENRY, DAVID H. WETMORE, CHAD F. WOLF.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(PARKER, VIVECA) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK Telephone Conference held on 9/22/20 (mbh, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER THAT ON OR BEFORE 9/25/20 COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S 8/13/20 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 9/23/20. 9/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Letter dated 9/21/20 from Viveca D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter to Judge Surrick dated September 22, 2020 by DEVANG PATEL Letter in Response to Government's letter (HUFSTADER, REBECCA) Modified on 9/24/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Status Report on Request for USM 285 Form (mbh, ) (mbh, ). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to WILLIAM P. BARR, JAMES MCHENRY, DAVID H. WETMORE, CHAD F. WOLF. Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE on 8/27/20 (jpd, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDERED AS FOLLOWS THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED AS OF AUGUST 7, 2020; THE CLERK IS ORDERED TO ISSUE A SUMMONS; AND THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL IS ORDERED TO SERVE THE SUMMONS WITH A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND THIS ORDER ON DEFENDANTS. THE UNITED STATES WILL ADVANCE THE COSTS OF SERVICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/25/20. 8/26/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jpd, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT THE GOVERNMENT'S EXECUTION OF PLAINTIFF DEVANG PATEL'S FINAL ORDER OF REMOVAL (DATED May 11, 2020)IS STAYED PENDING THE COURT'S DETERMINATION REGARDING WHETHER IT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER; THE STAY WILL EXPIRE IN 14 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER, UNLESS OTHERWISE ORDERED BY THE COURT; COUNSEL FOR THE GOVERNMENT SHALL IMMEDITATELY SERVE COPY OF THIS ORDER ON THE APPROPRIATE OFFICIALS WHO HAVE AUTHORITY OVER ENSURING COMPLIANCE WITH THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/8/2020.8/8/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (ALSO BY CHAMBERS).(afm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute Entry for proceedings- Emergency Motion Hearing held in Courtroom 8A on 8/8/2020 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK Court Reporter: ESR. (afm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for a Telephone Conference proceedings held on 8/7/2020 before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK. (afm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, JAMES MCHENRY, DAVID H. WETMORE, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibits Part 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibits Part 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibits Part 3, #6 Certificate of Service)(FINKELSTEIN, VERONICA) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Memorandum in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order regarding Court's jurisdiction filed by DEVANG PATEL. (HUFSTADER, REBECCA) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing:EMERGENCY HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SET FOR 8/8/2020 AT 01:00 PM IN COURTROOM 8AM BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK.(dmd, ) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by VIVECA D PARKER on behalf of WILLIAM P. BARR, JAMES MCHENRY, DAVID H. WETMORE, CHAD F. WOLF with Certificate of Service(PARKER, VIVECA) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DEVANG PATEL.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUFSTADER, REBECCA) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION/PETITION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by DEVANG PATEL. (HUFSTADER, REBECCA) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DEVANG PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(EATON, JONAH) Modified on 8/7/2020 (fb). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIVECA D PARKER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VERONICA JANE FINKELSTEIN