This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 07:50:36 (UTC).

Patel et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Patel filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00240

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Savitaben Patel

Ishverbhai Patel

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jason B Freeman

Attorney at Freeman Law PLLC (Frisco)

2595 Dallas Pkwy Ste 420

Frisco, TX 75034

Sloane Ryan Lile

Attorney at Eller & Detrich

2727 E 21St St Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74114

Andrew Addison Shank

Attorney at Eller & Detrich

2727 E 21St St Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74114

Respondent Attorney

Gretchen Ellen Nygaard

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (CIVIL RM 7238)

Po Box 7238 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/20/2019, Replies due by 7/4/2019); granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel ; (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) by United States of America [Note: Attorney Gretchen Ellen Nygaard added to party United States of America(pty:res).] (Nygaard, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service Internal Revenue Service by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service Attorney General of the United States by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service R. Trent Shores, US Attorney by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sloane Ryan Lile on behalf of Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Addison Shank on behalf of Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Shank, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) by United States of America [Note: Attorney Gretchen Ellen Nygaard added to party United States of America(pty:res).] (Nygaard, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Shank, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) (see document number #18 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 6/20/2019, Replies due by 7/4/2019); granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Support of Motion (Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel ; (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V. Eagan, referring case to Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy for all further proceedings in accordance with his jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636 (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): (No Reply allowed) ( Responses due by 5/24/2019) (Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #2 MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) ) by United States of America [Note: Attorney Gretchen Ellen Nygaard added to party United States of America(pty:res).] (Nygaard, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service Internal Revenue Service by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • ***Remark: Paper copy of previous entry mailed to attorney Jason B Freeman per the manual noticing instructions on the receipt (Re: Case Converted to a Civil Case ) (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Frank H. McCarthy (Re: #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason Brent Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2038319) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason Brent Freeman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2038319) by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (With attachments) (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service Attorney General of the United States by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT/CERTIFICATE/PROOF/RETURN of Service R. Trent Shores, US Attorney by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sloane Ryan Lile on behalf of Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Lile, Sloane) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Addison Shank on behalf of Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Shank, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Quash Formal Document Requests (paid $47 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2030523) by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (With attachments) (Shank, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ishverbhai Patel, Savitaben Patel (Shank, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less