This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2021 at 03:19:30 (UTC).

PATEL et al v. AKBRUDIN

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 PATEL filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against AKBRUDIN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is W LOUIS SANDS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W LOUIS SANDS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRISHNA PATEL

Adel, GA 31620

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DAVIS HARRIS

CHARLES M WALKER

VISHNU SUTARIA

JAMES A FREEMAN

WILLIAM GALLAGHER

ROGER CHINCHILLA

ROGER ZIEMS

SET HUNTER

HP RATHOD

DESAI P VINUBHAI

JEFF GABRIEL

MILIAN SARAIYA

CONSTANCE RHEINSCHELD

Murfreesboro, TN 37129

BOB JOHNSON

JAYNANT PATEL

A K SINGH

TARAL BHATT

RONAK MANSURI

NARENDRA MODI

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOHN A LOCKETT, III

1397 Carroll Dr

Atlanta, GA 30318

Other Attorneys

BLAKE H JOINER

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG LLP

303 Peachtree St, Suite 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Charles Herrick Morgan

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1201 West Peachtree Street, One Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

RACHEL FRIEDMAN

420 20Th St N Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

HENRY THOMAS SHAW

411 Gordon Avenue

Thomasville, GA 31792

AMANDA MCDOWELL

701 Fifth Ave, Ste 5600

Seattle, WA 98104

R BENJAMIN CRITTENDEN

175 East Main Street, Suite 200

Lexington, KY 40507

Thomas Ryan Mock, Jr.

303 Peachtree St, Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

SUN S CHOY

100 Galleria Pkwy Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

ASHLEY BROOKE TIPTON

120 30Th Ave N

Nashville, TN 37203

THOMAS C FENTON

401 S 4Th St, Ste 1200

Louisville, KY 40202-3428

JASON ROBERT ROTTNER

1201 W Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309

JOHN T MCGARVEY

401 South Fourth Street, Suite 1200

Louisville, KY 40202

STEVEN E ANDERSON

120 30Th Ave N

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#249

#248

#247

#246

#245

#244

#243

#242

#218

1 #23

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #21

Part 22

1 #20

Part 21

1 #19

Part 20

1 #17

Part 18

1 #4

Part 5

1 #3

Part 4

1 #2

Part 3

1 #1

Part 2

470 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#249) Mail Returned - #247 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, sent to Constance Rheinscheld, Doug Hughes, and Rita Burrell returned as undeliverable. (sbd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#248) Mail Returned - #242 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Amended Motion, sent to Constance Rheinscheld, Doug Hugh, and Rita Burrell returned as undeliverable. (sbd) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#247) ORDER denying #244 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #245 Motion for Reconsideration.The Court ORDERS that Defendants in this case are hereby excused from responding to Plaintiffs' future filings in this case, unless and until ordered otherwise by the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/26/2021. (rlw) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#246) RESPONSE filed by STEVEN L LEFKOVITZ re #245 MOTION for Reconsideration re #242 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,,,, Order on Amended Motion,,,, #244 MOTION for Reconsideration re #242 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,,,, Order on Amended Motion,,, (Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#245) MOTION for Reconsideration re #242 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Amended Motion filed by VIJAY PATEL.(rlw) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#244) MOTION for Reconsideration re #242 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Amended Motion Filed by KRISHNA PATEL.(rlw) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#243) Mail Returned - #242 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Amended Motion sent to Doug Hughes, Rita Burrell, and Constance Rheinscheld returned as undeliverable. (rlw) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#242) ORDER denying #217 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying #218 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying #222 Amended Motion to Alter Judgment; denying #223 Amended Motion to Alter Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/6/2021. (rlw) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#241) REPLY to Response filed by VIJAY PATEL re #218 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: #212 Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - Affidavit of Server Processor from India)(sbd) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#240) REPLY to Response filed by KRISHNA PATEL re #217 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: #212 Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - Affidavit of Server Processor from India)(sbd) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion for TRO. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/14/2019. (rlw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Filing Rico Statement by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10)(sbd) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendants continued)(rlw) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXHIBIT LIST by VIJAY PATEL re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 - Exhibit 1 to Exhibit 23, #2 Part 2 - Exhibit 24 to Exhibit 36)(rlw) Modified to correct filing date on 11/13/2019 (rlw). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Judicial Notice filed by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL.(sbd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL. (sbd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 65 AFFIDAVIT by VIJAY PATEL, KRISHNA PATEL. (sbd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 65(b) DECLARATION by VIJAY PATEL. (sbd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 65(b) DECLARATION by KRISHNA PATEL. (sbd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Filing Fee $ 400, Receipt Number 42354, filed by VIJAY PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16, #16 Part 17, #17 Part 18, #18 Part 19, #19 Part 20, #20 Part 21, #21 Part 22, #22 List of Defendants, #23 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger Benjamin Crittenden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas C. Fenton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven E. Anderson