This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2022 at 07:50:43 (UTC).

Patagonia, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 Patagonia, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00832

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patagonia, Inc.

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Marcella Deshonda Slay

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 South Wacker Dr. Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#33

RESTRICTED

#32

(#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 4/13/22. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #16 and motion for electronic service of process #22 are granted. Enter temporary restraining order. (ca, ) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#31

(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Per the request of counsel, the motion hearing set for 4/7/22 is reset for 4/13/22 at 9:00 a.m. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#30

(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #16 and motion for electronic service of process #22 is set for 4/7/22 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#29

(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to withdraw by Abby M. Neu #28 is granted. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#28

(#28) MOTION by Attorney Abby M. Neu to withdraw as attorney for Patagonia, Inc.. No party information provided (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff is given until 3/14/22 to submit a memorandum of law supporting personal jurisdiction that engages in detail with the personal jurisdiction analysis in Rubik's Brand, Ltd. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A," No 20-cv-5338, 2021 WL 825668 (N.D. Ill. Mar. 4, 2021). (ca, ) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#22

(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #16 and motion for electronic service of process #22 is set for 4/7/22 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#16

(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #16 and motion for electronic service of process #22 is set for 4/7/22 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Patagonia, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (jmk, ) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/13/2022. (bg, ) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 4/13/22. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #16 and motion for electronic service of process #22 are granted. Enter temporary restraining order. (ca, ) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Per the request of counsel, the motion hearing set for 4/7/22 is reset for 4/13/22 at 9:00 a.m. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #16 and motion for electronic service of process #22 is set for 4/7/22 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to withdraw by Abby M. Neu #28 is granted. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION by Attorney Abby M. Neu to withdraw as attorney for Patagonia, Inc.. No party information provided (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MEMORANDUM text entry, #25 by Patagonia, Inc. in Support of Personal Jurisdiction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff is given until 3/14/22 to submit a memorandum of law supporting personal jurisdiction that engages in detail with the personal jurisdiction analysis in Rubik's Brand, Ltd. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A," No 20-cv-5338, 2021 WL 825668 (N.D. Ill. Mar. 4, 2021). (ca, ) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Marcella Deshonda Slay (Slay, Marcella) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Patagonia, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Patagonia, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Patagonia, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19159293. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATAGONIA INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcella Deshonda Slay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson M. Martin