This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2021 at 08:22:48 (UTC).

Patagonia, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Patagonia, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05617

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patagonia, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Lisa General Merchandise Store

Shop910362014 Store

ForeverStar officieel Store

Single PA Store

DAMAIDOU01 Store

Disney -Belle's- Store

cico Store

KKYY Store

Gdaya

AiLianShangMao

XiangYangGeFanLinJiaJuGongSi

yuzhoushiaimei

kanggua

SIX FOXES International

cheapsneakers

ZSBO Clothing Factory

kongfu911

sandra_studios

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Thomas Joseph Juettner

Attorney at Greer, Burns, & Crain Ltd

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Kevin W. Guynn

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/22/2021. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing held and continued to 1/20/22 at 9:30 a.m. Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The Clerk is directed to unseal all previously sealed documents. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

36 #1

Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner

#36

(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patagonia, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner)(Juettner, Thomas) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/22/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

34 #2

Exhibit 1

34 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#34

(#34) MEMORANDUM by Patagonia, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#33

(#33) MOTION by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Lisa General Merchandise Store, Shop910362014 Store, ForeverStar officieel Store, Single PA Store, DAMAIDOU01 Store, Disney -Belle's- Store, cico Store, KKYY Store, Gdaya, AiLianShangMao, XiangYangGeFanLinJiaJuGongSi, yuzhoushiaimei, kanggua, SIX FOXES International, cheapsneakers, ZSBO Clothing Factory, kongfu911, sandra_studios, libao258369, shihua20190217, Zhannifu888, Qnfy001, fashionbag116, Zzhen168, Aifuzhuang, Bagsbay, Cococodh, dhgateangelco, Fengdhgates, Luxury Designer, mingsdhgateso, Funstudio, Clothesdhgat, Cthebelt38, ESS Fashion brand clothing, OFF Brand clothing store, Jumei Shangpin home trade, Web3, Ddx2025, Lilycn, H6066, Topsy, Trad222, Palaces, carmelitaandco.com, hellovwe.com, hotjackets.top, redressedclothing.com, evavoortman.com, renagregory.com, southerntextileresearch.com, patagoniafi.com, patagoniaireland-sale.com, patagoniajackensale.com, patagoniajapan-outlet.com, patagonianzsale.com, patagoniaoutlet.cc, patagoniaoutletnederland.com, patagoniasale-australia.com, patagonia-sale-usa.com, patagoniaschweizoutlet.com, patagoniasconti.com, patagoniaskleppolska.com, patagoniasolde.com, patagonia-suomi.com, patagoniaturkiyeoutlet.com, patagoniauk-sale.com, patagoutdooruk.com, patagoutdoorus.com, baggiessingapore.com, betterflowerdelivery.com, fjordflannelindia.com, icepalmclothing.com, jacketpatagus.com, jppatagonsales.com, lhvcob.top, outletpatagoniaespana.com, sportoutdoorca.com, surfrabais.com, tgjiayu.xyz and tiendapatagoniamexico.com added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/22/2021. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing held and continued to 1/20/22 at 9:30 a.m. Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The Clerk is directed to unseal all previously sealed documents. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patagonia, Inc. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Juettner)(Juettner, Thomas) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/22/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEMORANDUM by Patagonia, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #33 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (jj, ) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing held and continued to 11/22/21 at 9:30 a.m. Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #26 is granted. The temporary restraining order is extended through 11/25/21. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (daj, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Patagonia, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Patagonia, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18794245. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATAGONIA INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin W. Guynn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaku Begert