This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:47:00 (UTC).

Pastukh et al v. Harbor Club Owners Association Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Pastukh filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Harbor Club Owners Association Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Irina Pastukh

Audrey Pastukh

All other persons similarly situated

Defendants

Harbor Club Owners Association Inc.

Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC d/b/a Legacy Vacation Club

Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott M. Wellikoff

Attorney at Adler Wellikoff, PLLC

Suite 107, 1300 N. Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorneys

Lin J. Wagner

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, PC

390 N Orange Ave, Ste 1285

Orlando, FL 32801

Alicia M. Chiu

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, PC

390 N Orange Ave, Ste 1285

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC d/b/a Legacy Vacation Club with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16320475) filed by Irina Pastukh, Audrey Pastukh, All other persons similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Habor Club Summons, #4 Proposed Summons Legacy Summons)(Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/8/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh. (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Legacy Hospitality Holdings, LLC for Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC.. (Chiu, Alicia) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

1 #4

Proposed Summons Legacy Summons

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lin J. Wagner on behalf of Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC (Wagner, Lin) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue

#7

(#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to show cause filed by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh. (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Plaintiffs to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/4/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Harbor Club Owners Association Inc. and Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RDO) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#11

(#11) WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/10/2020 by Irina Pastukh, Audrey Pastukh as to Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC. (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice of compliance (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh. Related case(s): NO (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Habor Club Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Summons

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related case order by Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC. Related case(s): yes (Chiu, Alicia) Modified on 2/28/2020 (SPM). (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lin J. Wagner on behalf of Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC (Wagner, Lin) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Legacy Hospitality Holdings, LLC for Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC.. (Chiu, Alicia) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice of compliance (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/10/2020 by Irina Pastukh, Audrey Pastukh as to Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC. (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER upon consideration of the #7 Response to order to show cause filed by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh. It is ORDERED that the #6 Order to show cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/5/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh. (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh. Related case(s): NO (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 Order to show cause filed by Audrey Pastukh, Irina Pastukh. (Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Plaintiffs to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/4/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/8/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/8/2020. (LAM) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Harbor Club Owners Association Inc. and Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RDO) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-22-Orl-31GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Harbor Club Owners Association Inc., Legacy Vacation Club Services LLC d/b/a Legacy Vacation Club with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16320475) filed by Irina Pastukh, Audrey Pastukh, All other persons similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Habor Club Summons, #4 Proposed Summons Legacy Summons)(Wellikoff, Scott) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.