This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:58:17 (UTC).

Paskowitz v. CBL & Associates Properties, Inc. et al (JRG1)

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Paskowitz filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against CBL Associates Properties, Inc JRG1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURENCE PASKOWITZ

Defendants

STEPHEN D. LEBOVITZ

FARZANA KHALEEL

CHARLES B. LEBOVITZ

Larry Chapman

CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.

A. Larry Chapman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul K Bramlett

Attorney at Bramlett Law Office

P.O. Box 150734

Nashville, TN 37215

Thomas James McKenna

Attorney at Gainey, McKenna & Egleston

400 Park Avenue S, Floor 5

New York, NY 10016-8012

Robert Preston Bramlett

Attorney at Bramlett Law Office

P.O. Box 150734

Nashville, TN 37215

Gregory M Egleston

Attorney at Gainey, McKenna & Egleston

400 Park Avenue S, Floor 5

New York, NY 10016-8012

Roy L Jacobs

Attorney at Roy Jacobs & Associates

420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 2440

New York, NY 10170

Defendant Attorney

Scott M Shaw

Attorney at Evans Harrison Hackett PLLC

One Central Plaza, 835 Georgia Avenue, Suite 800

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Certificate of Corporate Interest by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.. (Shaw, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

18 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#18

(#18) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Order Addressing Certain early Scheduling Matters by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Shaw, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M Shaw on behalf of All Defendants (Shaw, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

15 #1

envelope

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Laurence Paskowitz re #3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), (Attachments: #1 envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing of Thomas J. McKenna-USDC-SDNYC

#13

Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Thomas J. McKenna ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3989486.) filed by Laurence Paskowitz as to Laurence Paskowitz (DJH) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#3

(#15) NOTICE by Laurence Paskowitz re #3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), (Attachments: #1 envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

2 #2

Summons Charles B. Lebovitz

1 #7

Summons for FARZANA KHALEEL

1 #6

Summons for LARRY CHAPMAN

1 #5

Summons for CHARLES LEBOVITZ

1 #4

Summons for STEPHEN LEBOVITZ

1 #3

Summons for CBL

1 #2

Other Civil Cover sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-Shareholder Certification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3975556.), filed by LAURENCE PASKOWITZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Shareholder Certification, #2 Other Civil Cover sheet, #3 Summons for CBL, #4 Summons for STEPHEN LEBOVITZ, #5 Summons for CHARLES LEBOVITZ, #6 Summons for LARRY CHAPMAN, #7 Summons for FARZANA KHALEEL)(Bramlett, Paul) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Certificate of Corporate Interest by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.. (Shaw, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.. (BDG) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Order Addressing Certain early Scheduling Matters by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Shaw, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M Shaw on behalf of All Defendants (Shaw, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Copy of docket sheet mailed to Atty Thomas James McKenna showing order granting PHV motion (DJH) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 6-20-19. (KMG) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE by Laurence Paskowitz re #3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), (Attachments: #1 envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Copy of docket sheet mailed to Atty Gregory M. Egleston showing order granting PHV motion (DJH) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 6-5-19. (KMG) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Thomas J. McKenna ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3989486.) filed by Laurence Paskowitz as to Laurence Paskowitz (DJH) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laurence Paskowitz. (Bramlett, Paul) (Entered: 06/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laurence Paskowitz. Stephen D. Lebovitz waiver sent on 5/31/2019. (Bramlett, Paul) (Entered: 06/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laurence Paskowitz. CBL & Associates Properties, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2019. (Bramlett, Paul) (Entered: 06/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 05/20/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Roy Jacobs and Gregory Egleston) (CAT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 05/20/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Gregory Egleston, and Roy Jacobs) (CAT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 05/20/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Roy Jacobs, and Gregory Egleston) (CAT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys Gregory Egleston, Thomas McKenna, & Roy Jacobs are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Gregory Egleston and Roy Jacobs; Copy through NEF to Thomas McKenna) (CAT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Summons A. Larry Chapman, #2 Summons Charles B. Lebovitz, #3 Summons Farzana Khaleel, #4 Summons Stephen D. Lebovitz) (CAT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CAT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3975556.), filed by LAURENCE PASKOWITZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Shareholder Certification, #2 Other Civil Cover sheet, #3 Summons for CBL, #4 Summons for STEPHEN LEBOVITZ, #5 Summons for CHARLES LEBOVITZ, #6 Summons for LARRY CHAPMAN, #7 Summons for FARZANA KHALEEL)(Bramlett, Paul) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.