This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 07:59:26 (UTC).

Paskova v. MEhome NY Realty Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Paskova filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against MEhome NY Realty Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Kuntz, II and Cheryl L. Pollak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00981

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yana Paskova

Defendant

MEhome NY Realty Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig B. Sanders

Attorney at Sanders Law Group

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

James H. Freeman

Attorney at Sanders Law Group

100 Garden City Plaza, Ste 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman LLP

1 Penn Plz, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by MEhome NY Realty Inc.. (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/25/2022 @ 2:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-0981. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/23/2022. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants motion for an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. ECF No. 9. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by April 25, 2022 at 5:00 P.M. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/22/2022. (Herrera, Isaiah) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#9

(#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by MEhome NY Realty Inc.. (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Yong Chen on behalf of MEhome NY Realty Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Yana Paskova (aty to be noticed) (Freeman, James) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yana Paskova. MEhome NY Realty Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

5 #1

complaint

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to MEhome NY Realty Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit DMCA Screengrab Infringement

1 #2

Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph

1 #1

Exhibit Original Photograph

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued MEhome NY Realty Inc. answer due 5/25/2022. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/21/2022. (Blair, Zachary) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by MEhome NY Realty Inc.. (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/25/2022 @ 2:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-0981. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/23/2022. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants motion for an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. ECF No. 9. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by April 25, 2022 at 5:00 P.M. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/22/2022. (Herrera, Isaiah) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by MEhome NY Realty Inc.. (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Yong Chen on behalf of MEhome NY Realty Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Chen, Yong) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Yana Paskova (aty to be noticed) (Freeman, James) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yana Paskova. MEhome NY Realty Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to MEhome NY Realty Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MEhome NY Realty Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15315072 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Yana Paskova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph, #3 Exhibit DMCA Screengrab Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen