This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 08:03:29 (UTC).

Arash Pashaei v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Arash Pashaei filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Steve Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10955

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arash Pashaei

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc.

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy David Scherwin

Attorney at Scherwin Law Firm

1055 West 7Th Street 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Rolf Adler

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Bradley Joseph Hamburger

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rachel Susan Brass

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #7

Exhibit Notice of service

4 #6

Exhibit Summons

4 #5

Exhibit Civil case cover sheet

4 #4

Exhibit Complaint

4 #3

Exhibit Docket sheet

4 #2

Exhibit Census report

4 #1

Exhibit Stipulation

#4

#3

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Arash Pashaei. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Scherwin, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Arash Pashaei, upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/18/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Rachel S. Brass, Counsel for Defendant. Submitted with Attachment 7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Bradley J. Hamburger #4 (car) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Does 1-25, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Arash Pashaei. Filed in State Court on 7/27/2020 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Bradley J. Hamburger #4 (car) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Adler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Amazon.com, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration, #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 12/2/2020. (Adler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Bradley J. Hamburger re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Exhibit Census report, #3 Exhibit Docket sheet, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Civil case cover sheet, #6 Exhibit Summons, #7 Exhibit Notice of service)(Adler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Adler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Adler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV28280 Receipt No: ACACDC-29310854 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attorney Daniel Rolf Adler added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Adler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less