This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:51:26 (UTC).

S.P. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 S P filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharion Aycock and David A. Sanders. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00215

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharion Aycock

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Skylar Partlow

S. P.

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Roger Franks, Jr.

Attorney at WHEELER & FRANKS

P.O. Box 681

Tupelo, MS 38802

Defendant Attorneys

Rajita Iyer Moss

Attorney at Wells Marble

P.O. Box 131, 300 Concourse Boulevard

Ridgeland, MS 39205-0131

Gregg A. Caraway

Attorney at WELLS MARBLE & HURST, PLLC

P. O. Box 131

Jackson, MS 39205-0131

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice by reason of settlement. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/08/2020. (ajs)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Caraway, Gregg)

10 #5

Notice of Filing NOR

#10

(#10) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Returned Executed, #5 Notice of Filing NOR) (Moss, Rajita)

10 #3

Summons

10 #4

Returned Executed

10 #1

State Court Complaint

10 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) ORDER Restricting Access and Requiring Submission of Redacted Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/12/19. (def)

#8

(#8) Restricted Document - STATE COURT RECORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons Return, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (jla)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Certified State Court Record by Rajita Iyer Moss on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Moss, Rajita)

#6

(#6) ORDER Changing the Style of the Case; Restricting Access and Directing the Filing of the State Court Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/11/19. (def)

5 #1

Redacted Order granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Liberty Mutual Insurance answer due 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/9/2019. (def) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2019: #1 Redacted Order granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) (jtm).

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance, filed by S.P. (jla) Modified on 12/11/2019 (jla).

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance from Itawamba County Circuit Court, case number CV19-212WI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1744758) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice by reason of settlement. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/08/2020. (ajs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Caraway, Gregg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Returned Executed, #5 Notice of Filing NOR) (Moss, Rajita)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Restricting Access and Requiring Submission of Redacted Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/12/19. (def)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Restricted Document - STATE COURT RECORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons Return, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Certified State Court Record by Rajita Iyer Moss on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Moss, Rajita)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Changing the Style of the Case; Restricting Access and Directing the Filing of the State Court Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/11/19. (def)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Liberty Mutual Insurance answer due 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/9/2019. (def) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2019: #1 Redacted Order granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) (jtm).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Moss, Rajita)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance (Caraway, Gregg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance, filed by S.P. (jla) Modified on 12/11/2019 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance from Itawamba County Circuit Court, case number CV19-212WI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1744758) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.