This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2021 at 08:57:08 (UTC).

Partie v. Ethicon Women's Health and Urology et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 Partie filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Women's Health and Urology. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01366

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norma Jean Partie

Defendants

Ethicon Women's Health and Urology

Ethicon, Inc

Gynecare

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mike Hieu Thien Nguyen

Attorney at Nguyen & Associates, LLC

6831 Ponderosa Way

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Defendant Attorneys

Robert R. McCoy

Attorney at Kaempfer Crowell

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 650

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Sihomara L. Graves

Attorney at Kaempfer Crowell

50 West Liberty Street, Suite 700

Reno, NV 89501

Anita Modak-Truran

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

Suite 1600, 150 Third Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Exhibit A-1

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

#11

10 #2

Exhibit B Attachment

10 #1

Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Exhibit Ex A - Minute Order (ECF No. 3)

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit Ex B - Summonses

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1) (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Norma Jean Partie. Replies due by 9/14/2021. (Nguyen, Mike) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anita Modak-Truran and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6619305) by Defendants Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B Attachment) (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 9/6/2021. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS REPORT Concerning Removal by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Norma Jean Partie. (Nguyen, Mike) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Norma Jean Partie. No changes to parties. (Nguyen, Mike) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Minute Order (ECF No. 3)) (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 8/9/2021. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/5/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Other Affiliate Ethicon, Inc for Johnson & Johnson; Other Affiliate Gynecare for Ethicon, Inc added. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, District of Nevada, Case Number A-21-830270-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6565099) by Ethicon, Inc, Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Summonses) (McCoy, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Women's Health and Urology is a litigant

Latest cases where Gynecare is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant