This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2021 at 11:00:46 (UTC).

Parsons v. Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Parsons filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00113

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Taft Parsons

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Carol Parsons

Defendant

PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean A Bukowski

Attorney at Mayer Graff & Wallace LLP

1425 Memorial Drive, Suite B

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Ryan R Graff

Attorney at Mayer Graff & Wallace LLP

1425 Memorial Drive, Suite B

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorneys

Christina A Katt

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

740 N Plankinton Ave - Ste 600

Milwaukee, WI 53203-2412

Michael J Duffy

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

55 W Monroe St - Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Removal

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/15/2021. The defendant's counsel has filed a letter, indicating that the parties have scheduled an early mediation for April 15, 2021 and requesting that the deadline for the parties to submit a joint Rule 26(f) report, currently March 26, 2021, be extended until a week after the early mediation is scheduled to take place. Dkt. No. 10. The court GRANTS the defendant's request and ORDERS that the deadline for the parties to submit their joint Rule 26(f) report is EXTENDED until the end of the day on April 22, 2021. If the mediation is successful, the parties will notify the court. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER from Christina Katt to Court regarding mediation. (Katt, Christina)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/24/2021. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 3/26/2021. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Katt, Christina)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford.(Katt, Christina)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/3/2021 re #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 22, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. (Katt, Christina)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Graff, Ryan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Duffy on behalf of Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael Duffy (Duffy, Michael)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Christina A. Katt in Support of Notice of Removal (Katt, Christina)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 20-CV-7437 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3712464) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Removal)(Katt, Christina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina A Katt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael John Duffy