This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2020 at 08:02:59 (UTC).

Parsons v. Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Parsons filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene C. Berger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00132

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene C. Berger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alma Parsons

Defendant

Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott D. Perlmuter

Attorney at NOVAK ROBENALT & PAVLIK

Skylight Office Tower, Suite 950, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113-1498

Michael C. Walker

Attorney at BURNSIDE LAW

Suite 201, 1426 Sixth Avenue

Huntington, WV 25701

Defendant Attorneys

John F. Dascoli

2442 Kanawha Boulevard East

Charleston, WV 25311

Jordan L. Glasgow

Attorney at BLAKE & UHLIG

Suite 475, 753 State Avenue

Kansas City, KS 66101

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amendments and Joinder due by 6/12/2020. All discovery requests due by 5/15/2020. All discovery due by 6/12/2020. Depositions to be completed by 07/03/2020. Summary Judgment and Other Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2020. Settlement Meeting held at least 45 days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Mediation must be concluded at least 30 days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due at least 30 days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 10/5/2020. Plaintiff's proposed integrated pretrial order due by 10/7/2020. Opposing portion due by 10/14/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference to be held on 10/21/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Bench trial to be held on 10/26/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/9/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM by Alma Parsons in opposition to #11 MOTION by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (slr)

#17

(#17) ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the #16 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Instanter be GRANTED. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/1/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)

16 #1

Proposed Memorandum in Opposition

#16

(#16) MOTION by Alma Parsons for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Instanter with proposed document attached (Attachment: #1 Proposed Memorandum in Opposition)(Perlmuter, Scott)

#15

(#15) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Scott Perlmuter on behalf of Alma Parsons. Local counsel: Michael C Walker. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7583994. (Walker, Michael)

11 #3

Exhibit B

11 #2

Exhibit A

#11

(#18) MEMORANDUM by Alma Parsons in opposition to #11 MOTION by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (slr)

#9

No Description Available

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

No Description Available

#5

(#5) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 1/14/20. Court encouraged counsel to follow Civil Case Management Procedures (Doc. #3 ) and have a full and complete disclosure with each other about the merits of potential motion practice. Phone Status to discuss the matter further set for 2/7/20 at 10:30 AM (EST) (note time change). Court will initiate the call. In the interim, all legal filings are stayed. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/15/20. (S,Na) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#5) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 1/14/20. Court encouraged counsel to follow Civil Case Management Procedures (Doc. #3 ) and have a full and complete disclosure with each other about the merits of potential motion practice. Phone Status to discuss the matter further set for 2/7/20 at 10:30 AM (EST) (note time change). Court will initiate the call. In the interim, all legal filings are stayed. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/15/20. (S,Na) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #19 Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting. ERROR: Image did not contain electronic signatures. CORRECTION: Signatures corrected and image replaced. (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amendments and Joinder due by 6/12/2020. All discovery requests due by 5/15/2020. All discovery due by 6/12/2020. Depositions to be completed by 07/03/2020. Summary Judgment and Other Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2020. Settlement Meeting held at least 45 days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Mediation must be concluded at least 30 days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due at least 30 days prior to the Pretrial Conference. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 10/5/2020. Plaintiff's proposed integrated pretrial order due by 10/7/2020. Opposing portion due by 10/14/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference to be held on 10/21/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Bench trial to be held on 10/26/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/9/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust to #18 Memorandum In Opposition. (Glasgow, Jordan) (Modified on 4/9/2020 to correct link) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Alma Parsons. (Glasgow, Jordan) (Modified on 4/9/2020 to correct signatures and add party filer) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM by Alma Parsons in opposition to #11 MOTION by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (slr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the #16 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Instanter be GRANTED. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/1/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by Alma Parsons for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Instanter with proposed document attached (Attachment: #1 Proposed Memorandum in Opposition)(Perlmuter, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Scott Perlmuter on behalf of Alma Parsons. Local counsel: Michael C Walker. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7583994. (Walker, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust for Motion to Dismiss and Suggestions in Support. (Glasgow, Jordan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 3/25/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/1/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/8/2020. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 a.m. on 4/22/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/29/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 5/6/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record and to any unrepresented party) (mms)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 1/14/20. Court encouraged counsel to follow Civil Case Management Procedures (Doc. #3 ) and have a full and complete disclosure with each other about the merits of potential motion practice. Phone Status to discuss the matter further set for 2/7/20 at 10:30 AM (EST) (note time change). Court will initiate the call. In the interim, all legal filings are stayed. (20 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/15/20. (S,Na) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 1/14/20 at 3:00 PM (EST) before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Alma Parsons. Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020 filed on behalf of Alma Parsons (Perlmuter, Scott) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/2/2019. (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketJudge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9652720.. Filed by Alma Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Perlmuter, Scott) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/18/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less