This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 21:02:53 (UTC).

Parsittie v. Schneider Logistics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 Parsittie filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Schneider Logistics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Vince Chhabria. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00532

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rick Parsittie

Defendants

Schneider Logistics, Inc.

Connect Staffing, Inc.

Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc.

Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Farrah Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard,Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Sabrina Alexis Beldner

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew C. Kane

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Sylvia Jihae Kim

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sean M. Sullivan

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byRick Parsittie. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#21

(#21) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #20 Stipulation to Vacate the Initial Case Management Conference and Transfer Action to the Central District of California.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

20 #1

Proposed Order

20 #20

Main Document

19 #1

Proposed Order Granting Ptf's Request to Appear by Telephone at Case Manang

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or 12(f) filed by Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc., Schneider Logistics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/29/2019. Replies due by 5/6/2019. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#17

(#17) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byRick Parsittie. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 3/15/2019) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rick Parsittie.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 2/13/2019) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc., Schneider Logistics, Inc... (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Shaun Setareh Of Counsel (Ashley N. Batiste) (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 2/1/2019) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byRick Parsittie. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to the Central District of California as case 2:19-cv-03981. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #20 Stipulation to Vacate the Initial Case Management Conference and Transfer Action to the Central District of California.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO (1) VACATE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND (2) TRANSFER ACTION TO THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA filed by Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc., Schneider Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Rick Parsittie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ptf's Request to Appear by Telephone at Case Manangement Conference)(Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or 12(f) filed by Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc., Schneider Logistics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/29/2019. Replies due by 5/6/2019. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docket(#16) ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byRick Parsittie. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 3/15/2019) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #13 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint due by 3/15/2019. Defendants' response to SAC is due by 4/15/2019.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docket(#10) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rick Parsittie.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 2/13/2019) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc., Schneider Logistics, Inc... (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/12/2019) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or 12(f) filed by Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider Logistics Transportation, Inc., Schneider Logistics, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 2/20/2019. Replies due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/6/2019) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Shaun Setareh Of Counsel (Ashley N. Batiste) (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 2/1/2019) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/ 23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSLOADING AND DISTRIBUTION, INC., SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSPORTATION, INC., SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc. for SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSLOADING AND DISTRIBUTION, INC., SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSPORTATION, INC., SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS, INC.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2019) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 18CV335339. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13048376). Filed bySCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSLOADING AND DISTRIBUTION, INC., SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSPORTATION, INC., SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2019) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONNECT STAFFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant