This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2020 at 12:25:04 (UTC).

PARSHALL v. NEW RUE21, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2020 PARSHALL filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NEW RUE21, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L. Dodge. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00156

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia L. Dodge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISTY PARSHALL

Defendant

NEW RUE21, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Mapley

Attorney at Sobel, Wade & Mapley, LLC

55 Erieview Plaza, #370

Cleveland, OH 44114

Defendant Attorneys

Katelyn W. McCombs

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Emilie R. Hammerstein

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Ne Rue21

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. Parties are directed to advise the Court when arbitration has been completed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/25/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. The case is stayed pending arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 2/25/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by NEW RUE21, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NEW RUE21, LLC. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn W. McCombs on behalf of NEW RUE21, LLC. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie R. Hammerstein on behalf of NEW RUE21, LLC. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MISTY PARSHALL. NEW RUE21, LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Mapley, Peter) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to NEW RUE21, LLC (cjo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NEW RUE21, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5451145), filed by MISTY PARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ne Rue21) (cjo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New rue21, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emilie R. Hammerstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katelyn Whitney McCombs