This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 12:08:44 (UTC).

Parrott v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Parrott filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00305

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grace Parrott

Defendants

Microport Orthopedics Inc

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Blakely, Jr.

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

Post Office Box 19337

Atlanta, GA 31126-1337

N. Kirkland Pope

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

Post Office Box 19337

Atlanta, GA 31126-1337

Defendant Attorneys

Julie Y. Park

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130-2040

Erin Bosman

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130-2040

Erin Lupfer

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130-2040

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Microport Orthopedics Inc (Bosman, Erin) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Lupfer on behalf of Microport Orthopedics Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc (Lupfer, Erin) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Y. Park on behalf of Microport Orthopedics Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc (Park, Julie) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Bosman on behalf of Microport Orthopedics Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc (Bosman, Erin) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Microport Orthopedics Inc by Grace Parrott. (Pope, N.) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wright Medical Technology Inc by Grace Parrott. (Pope, N.) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/14/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Grace Parrott. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT081687.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microport Orthopedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Joseph Blakely, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer N. Kirkland Pope