This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:12:12 (UTC).

Parrish v. Doe

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Parrish filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa A. Jensen and Philip G. Reinhard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-50326

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisa A. Jensen

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Donte Parrish

Thomson, IL 61285

Respondent

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

AUSA - Rockford

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (Rockford)

327 South Church Street

Rockford, IL 61101

Jana L Brady

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

327 South Church, Suite 330

Rockford, IL 61101

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Petitioner Donte Parrish's motion for additional time to address the court's $5.00 filing fee requirement #5 is granted. The court extends the date to comply to January 30, 2020. As previously stated, his failure to comply will result in summary dismissal of this case without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/10/2020: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Donte Parrish against John Doe (pg, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Request To Extend 1/10/20 Deadline $5.00 Filing Fee by Donte Parrish (pg, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Petitioner Donte Parrish, a prisoner at the Thomson U.S. Penitentiary, has filed a 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition challenging the loss of good time credit. He has neither paid the $5.00 filing fee nor submitted an in forma pauperis (IFP) application demonstrating his inability to pay it. By January 10, 2020, he must either pay the filing fee (by check or money order made payable to the Clerk of Court, United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois) or submit a completed IFP application. His failure to comply will result in summary dismissal of this case without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall send a blank IFP application form to petitioner. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/11/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION of Jana L Brady as U.S. Attorney for Respondent John Doe (Brady, Jana) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Petitioner Donte Parrish's motion for additional time to address the court's $5.00 filing fee requirement #5 is granted. The court extends the date to comply to January 30, 2020. As previously stated, his failure to comply will result in summary dismissal of this case without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/10/2020: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request To Extend 1/10/20 Deadline $5.00 Filing Fee by Donte Parrish (pg, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Petitioner Donte Parrish, a prisoner at the Thomson U.S. Penitentiary, has filed a 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition challenging the loss of good time credit. He has neither paid the $5.00 filing fee nor submitted an in forma pauperis (IFP) application demonstrating his inability to pay it. By January 10, 2020, he must either pay the filing fee (by check or money order made payable to the Clerk of Court, United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois) or submit a completed IFP application. His failure to comply will result in summary dismissal of this case without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall send a blank IFP application form to petitioner. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/11/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION of Jana L Brady as U.S. Attorney for Respondent John Doe (Brady, Jana) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Donte Parrish against John Doe (pg, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.