This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 08:56:20 (UTC).

PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER et al v. BECERRA

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against BECERRA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard J. Leon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01922

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard J. Leon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER

NORTHCREST MEDICAL CENTER

SPRINGHILL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

UF HEALTH JACKSONVILLE

UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI HEALTH CARE

BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER

STORMONT VAIL HOSPITAL

Defendant

XAVIER BECERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad E. Kurtz

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

1200 Nineteenth Street, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Certified Mail Receipt for service of Summons and Complaint to US Attorney Gene

#7

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Summons

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/23/2021. (Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/13/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/12/2021. (Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjf) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia filed by BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, SPRINGHILL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, STORMONT VAIL HOSPITAL, NORTHCREST MEDICAL CENTER, PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER, UF HEALTH JACKSONVILLE, UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI HEALTH CARE. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, #7 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney, was entered in error and counsel was instructed not to refile said pleading. Summons have not been issued as to the U.S. Attorney General or U.S. Attorney for DC. (zjf) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/4/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/3/2021. (Kurtz, Chad) Modified on 8/10/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General August 3, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt for service of Summons and Complaint to US Attorney General)(Kurtz, Chad) Modified on 8/10/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. XAVIER BECERRA served on 7/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHCREST MEDICAL CENTER, PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER, SPRINGHILL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, STORMONT VAIL HOSPITAL, UF HEALTH JACKSONVILLE, UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI HEALTH CARE. Case related to Case No. 21-1250. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHCREST MEDICAL CENTER, PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER, SPRINGHILL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, STORMONT VAIL HOSPITAL, UF HEALTH JACKSONVILLE, UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI HEALTH CARE (Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8605227) filed by BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, SPRINGHILL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, STORMONT VAIL HOSPITAL, NORTHCREST MEDICAL CENTER, PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER, UF HEALTH JACKSONVILLE, UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI HEALTH CARE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Designation of Related Civil Case)(Kurtz, Chad) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER - EAST CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases where Northwest Medical Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad Evin Kurtz