This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:47:07 (UTC).

Parr v. The City of Milwaukee et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Parr against The City of Milwaukee in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01770

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zitelka R Parr

Milwaukee, WI 53201

Defendants

The Milwaukee Public Library

Laurel Kerstein

Katherine Caputa

Linda Vincent

The City of Milwaukee

Shamus Lavalle

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) TRANSMIT Order, Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent forms to US Marshal for service upon all defendants. (bx)

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/14/20 that Parr's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee #2 is GRANTED. Parr's motion to amend the complaint #3 is GRANTED. The U.S. Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon defendants. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (jad)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) LETTER (SECOND NOTICE) from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 14 days. (lz)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Amend Complaint to add additional relief wanted by Zitelka R Parr. (lz) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Zitelka R Parr. (amb) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Zitelka R Parr. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(amb) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSMIT Order, Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent forms to US Marshal for service upon all defendants. (bx)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/14/20 that Parr's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee #2 is GRANTED. Parr's motion to amend the complaint #3 is GRANTED. The U.S. Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon defendants. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (cc: via US Mail to Plaintiff) (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Zitelka R Parr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER (SECOND NOTICE) from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 14 days. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Amend Complaint to add additional relief wanted by Zitelka R Parr. (lz) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Zitelka R Parr. (amb) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Zitelka R Parr. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(amb) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.