This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:41:31 (UTC).

Parnass v. British Airways PLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Parnass filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against British Airways PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul A. Engelmayer and Kevin Nathaniel Fox. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04555

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

Referral Judge

Kevin Nathaniel Fox

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey D. Parnass

New York, NY 10024

Defendant

British Airways PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Marissa Nicole Lefland

Attorney at Condon and Forsyth LLP (NYC)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Anthony U Battista

Attorney at Condon and Forsyth LLP (NYC)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: An initial pretrial conference will be held in the above-captioned action on September 10, 2019, at 2:30 p.m., in courtroom 228, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 228, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 7/9/2019) (js) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. British Airways PLC, served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jaram, Intake Specialist for CT Corporation System. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Parnass. (sc) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marissa Nicole Lefland on behalf of British Airways PLC. (Lefland, Marissa) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by British Airways PLC.(Battista, Anthony) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent International Consolidated Airlines Group, S.A. for British Airways PLC. Document filed by British Airways PLC.(Battista, Anthony) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/21/2019) (ama) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against British Airways PLC. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Parnass. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: An initial pretrial conference will be held in the above-captioned action on September 10, 2019, at 2:30 p.m., in courtroom 228, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 228, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 7/9/2019) (js) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. British Airways PLC, served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jaram, Intake Specialist for CT Corporation System. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Parnass. (sc) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marissa Nicole Lefland on behalf of British Airways PLC. (Lefland, Marissa) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by British Airways PLC.(Battista, Anthony) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent International Consolidated Airlines Group, S.A. for British Airways PLC. Document filed by British Airways PLC.(Battista, Anthony) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/21/2019) (ama) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to British Airways PLC. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against British Airways PLC. Document filed by Jeffrey D. Parnass. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.