This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2021 at 08:21:55 (UTC).

Parmigiani-Pinchott v. Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Parmigiani-Pinchott filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02724

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Parmigiani-Pinchott

Defendants

Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc. A/K/A doing business as Fox21 News in Colorado Springs

Nexstar Media Group, Inc.

Nexstar Media Inc.

Nexstar Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher George Wilhelmi

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02724-DDD. (athom, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#9

(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Maria Parmigiani-Pinchott All parties do not consent.. (Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

7 #7

Main Document

5 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

5 #5

Main Document

3 #4

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

3 #3

Main Document

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02724-DDD. (athom, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02724-REB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, ) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Maria Parmigiani-Pinchott All parties do not consent.. (Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #7 Joint Motion to Arbitrate Claims, the parties' consent form deadline is reset to November 19, 2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/12/21. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Order to Arbitrate Claims by Plaintiff Maria Parmigiani-Pinchott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER: The #5 Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Claims is STRICKEN, as the parties cannot stipulate to such relief. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a) (stating that such requests for relief "must be approved by court order on motion"). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/08/21. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STRICKEN STIPULATION to Arbitrate Claims by Plaintiff Maria Parmigiani-Pinchott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wilhelmi, Christopher) Modified pursuant to #5 on 11/8/2021 (csarr, ). (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 12/7/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/7/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/12/2021. (evaug) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Nexstar Broadcasting, Inc., Nexstar Inc., Nexstar Media Group, Inc., Nexstar Media Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8117093)Attorney Christopher George Wilhelmi added to party Maria Parmigiani-Pinchott (pty:pla), filed by Maria Parmigiani-Pinchott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less