This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:22:05 (UTC).

Parks v. Taylor et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Parks filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Taylor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary M. Purcell and Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01137

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gary M. Purcell

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Alexander Parks

Cushing, OK 74023-5337

Defendants

Sean McKeehan

Tadasha Morris

Jason Everhart

FNU Taylor

Robert Benjamin

Danny Honeycutt

Matthew Yerby

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER FOR SPECIAL REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/23/2020. (cps) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF THE PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/23/2020. (cps) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) LETTER from Allen Parks (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth hereafter. Please see Order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/30/2019. (cps) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

7 #2

Envelope

7 #1

Attachment 1 - ODOC Statement

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 30th day of December, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/10/2019. (cps) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) NOTICE re: Institutional Account Statement by Allen Alexander Parks (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Entered by the direction of the Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/05/19. (nv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable David L. Russell no longer assigned to case. Entered by the direction of the Honorable David L. Russell on 12/05/19. (nv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) PREVIOUS Cases (nv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Attachment 2-Declaration B

1 #1

Attachment 1-Declaration A

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER FOR SPECIAL REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/23/2020. (cps) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF THE PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/23/2020. (cps) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER from Allen Parks (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth hereafter. Please see Order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/30/2019. (cps) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allen Alexander Parks. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - ODOC Statement, #2 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 30th day of December, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/10/2019. (cps) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE re: Institutional Account Statement by Allen Alexander Parks (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Entered by the direction of the Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/05/19. (nv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable David L. Russell no longer assigned to case. Entered by the direction of the Honorable David L. Russell on 12/05/19. (nv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PREVIOUS Cases (nv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert Benjamin, Jason Everhart, Danny Honeycutt, Sean McKeehan, Tadasha Morris, FNU Taylor, Matthew Yerby filed by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Declaration A, #2 Attachment 2-Declaration B, #3 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less