This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2020 at 08:39:34 (UTC).

Parks v. Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Parks filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shon T. Erwin and Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00205

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shon T. Erwin

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Alexander Parks

Defendants

Lauren Perez

Deputy FNU Boren

Sarah Reeves

Major FNU Herron

Shanasha Sigh

FNU Felz

Toni Woods

Shokooh Hopkins

Oklahoma County Detention Center

Christopher Hendershot

Gene Bradley

FNU Gilbert

Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County

Gayla Conrey

FNU DeCloud

Danny Honeycutt

Armor Correctional Health Inc

Ronnie Neal

FNU Henley

6 More Parties Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time titled "Motion for Extension of Time to Mail in To This Court The $10.99 Partial Initial Filing Fee" by Allen Alexander Parks. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to pay the initial filing fee as ordered by the Court. This report and recommendation terminates the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge unless and until the matter is re-referred. Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 4/21/2020. (mc) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis -- Having reviewed the Motion, the Court finds Plaintiff is entitled to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee, and his Motion is granted. However, Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350.00 filing fee as set forth hereafter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before April 13, 2020, Plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.99. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 3/25/2020. (mc) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 03/06/2020. (ank) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable Bernard Jones no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Honorable Bernard Jones on 03/06/2020. (ank) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PREVIOUS Cases. (ank) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Order by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Inmates Rqst for Disbursement, #2 Exhibit B - Inmate Mail History, #3 Exhibit C - Cover Letter dated 02-07-20, #4 Exhibit D - Return Envelope, #5 Exhibit E - Innmate Rqst re Outgoing Mail, #6 Exhibit F - New Complaint dated 02-07-20, #7 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Allen Alexander Parks. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less