This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:00:23 (UTC).

Parker v. United States Postal Service

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Parker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Postal Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leslie R. Hoffman and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02342

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lanekia Parker

Pinson, AL 35126

Defendant

United States Postal Service

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER directing compliance to Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. (Doc. 2 ("RCO"); Doc. 3 ("IPO").) Responses due by 2/14/2020 Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/30/2020. (JLC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL087509 filed by Lanekia Parker.(BIA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/28/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

#2

(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/28/2019.(JLC) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing compliance to Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. (Doc. 2 ("RCO"); Doc. 3 ("IPO").) Responses due by 2/14/2020 Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/30/2020. (JLC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/28/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/28/2019.(JLC) (Entered: 12/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL087509 filed by Lanekia Parker.(BIA) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.