This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 09:37:46 (UTC).

Parker v. Trustwave Holdings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Parker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Trustwave Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02544

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Parker

Denver, CO 80202

Defendants

Trustwave Holdings, Inc.

Trustwave Holdings, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Aubiron Trustwave

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Bryan Wesoky

Attorney at Darling Milligan PC

1331 17Th Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80202

Kylie Marie Schmidt

Attorney at Darling Milligan PC

1331 17Th Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Roger Glenn Trim

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC-Denver

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Tower Three, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80222

Steven R. Reid

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC-Denver

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Tower Three, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80222

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 September 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#15

(#15) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2020. Discovery Deadline: May 4, 2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline: June 24, 2021. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: February 4, 2021. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: March 4, 2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#14

(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Trustwave Holdings, Inc.. (Reid, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#13

(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Trustwave Holdings, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Reid, Steven) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Trustwave Holdings, Inc..(Trim, Roger) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/28/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/21/2020, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/25/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven R. Reid on behalf of Trustwave Holdings, Inc.Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Trustwave Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reid, Steven) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jason B. Wesoky and Kylie M. Schmidt by Jason Bryan Wesoky on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jason Bryan Wesoky added to party Dana Parker(pty:pla) (Wesoky, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons upon Trustwave Holdings, Inc on 08/03/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Trustwave Holdings, Inc., filed by Dana Parker.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Trim, Roger) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit B - Declaration of Brian Sanderson

1 #6

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service

1 #5

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Pretrial Order

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trustwave Holdings, Inc. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV32523. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7451542), filed by Trustwave Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Action - District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Pretrial Order, #6 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service, #7 Exhibit B - Declaration of Brian Sanderson, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trim, Roger) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 September 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 9/28/2020. Discovery Deadline: May 4, 2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline: June 24, 2021. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: February 4, 2021. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: March 4, 2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Trustwave Holdings, Inc.. (Reid, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Trustwave Holdings, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Reid, Steven) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Trustwave Holdings, Inc..(Trim, Roger) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/28/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/21/2020, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/25/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven R. Reid on behalf of Trustwave Holdings, Inc.Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Trustwave Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reid, Steven) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jason B. Wesoky and Kylie M. Schmidt by Jason Bryan Wesoky on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jason Bryan Wesoky added to party Dana Parker(pty:pla) (Wesoky, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/25/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons upon Trustwave Holdings, Inc on 08/03/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Trustwave Holdings, Inc., filed by Dana Parker.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Trim, Roger) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trustwave Holdings, Inc. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV32523. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7451542), filed by Trustwave Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Action - District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Pretrial Order, #6 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service, #7 Exhibit B - Declaration of Brian Sanderson, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trim, Roger) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less