This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 08:13:50 (UTC).

Parker v. TransUnion LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Parker filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TransUnion LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01731

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lauren Parker

Chicago, IL 60611

Defendants

TransUnion LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services LLC

Credit One Bank N.A.

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Natalie A. Barnaby

Attorney at Jones Day

110 North Wacker Drive, Suite 4800

Chicago, IL 60606

Christopher R Murphy

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

150 N Riverside Plaza, 27Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Ruddy S-A. Abam

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc.'s motion for extension of time #16 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 6/8/2022. Defendant Credit One Bank's motion to dismiss #18 is briefed as follows: Plaintiff is advised to review the Court's Standing Order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Consistent with the purpose of the Federal Rules "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, this Court's Standing Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether Plaintiff will amend the complaint under Rule 15(a)(1), or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. To this end, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) an amended complaint within the time limit set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) 6/14/2022 or (2) a response to the motion to dismiss by 6/21/2022. If Plaintiff files a response, Defendant shall file a reply by 7/5/2022. If Plaintiff elects to amend its pleading in response to the motion to dismiss, then Defendant shall file within 21 days of the amended pleading either: (1) an answer; or (2) a revised motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#21

(#21) Credit One Bank, N.A.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Credit One Bank N.A. (Murphy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM by Credit One Bank N.A. in support of motion to dismiss #19 Defendant Credit One Bank's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or in the Alternative for More Definite Statement (Murphy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#19

(#19) MOTION by Defendant Credit One Bank N.A. to dismiss Defendant Credit One Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, for more Definite Statement (Murphy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#18

(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#17

(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. by Ruddy S-A. Abam -- Amended Attorney Appearance (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#16

(#16) MOTION by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #7 (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#15

(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. by Ruddy S-A. Abam (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Credit One Bank N.A. by Christopher R Murphy (Murphy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

13 #3

USM-285

13 #2

Summons Returned Executed

13 #1

USM-285

#8

(#8) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Lauren Parker (bg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#7

(#16) MOTION by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #7 (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and directs the Clerk to issue summonses for Defendants TransUnion LLC; Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Equifax Information Services LLC; Credit One Bank N.A.; and Midland Credit Management Inc. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve summons. Plaintiff shall complete a USM-285 form for each Defendant being served, if she has not already done so. Plaintiff shall file a status report by 5/20/22 concerning service. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#3

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and directs the Clerk to issue summonses for Defendants TransUnion LLC; Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Equifax Information Services LLC; Credit One Bank N.A.; and Midland Credit Management Inc. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve summons. Plaintiff shall complete a USM-285 form for each Defendant being served, if she has not already done so. Plaintiff shall file a status report by 5/20/22 concerning service. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint by Lauren Parker (Exhibit) (lma, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc.'s motion for extension of time #16 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 6/8/2022. Defendant Credit One Bank's motion to dismiss #18 is briefed as follows: Plaintiff is advised to review the Court's Standing Order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Consistent with the purpose of the Federal Rules "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, this Court's Standing Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether Plaintiff will amend the complaint under Rule 15(a)(1), or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. To this end, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) an amended complaint within the time limit set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) 6/14/2022 or (2) a response to the motion to dismiss by 6/21/2022. If Plaintiff files a response, Defendant shall file a reply by 7/5/2022. If Plaintiff elects to amend its pleading in response to the motion to dismiss, then Defendant shall file within 21 days of the amended pleading either: (1) an answer; or (2) a revised motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Credit One Bank, N.A.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Credit One Bank N.A. (Murphy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM by Credit One Bank N.A. in support of motion to dismiss #19 Defendant Credit One Bank's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or in the Alternative for More Definite Statement (Murphy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION by Defendant Credit One Bank N.A. to dismiss Defendant Credit One Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, for more Definite Statement (Murphy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. by Ruddy S-A. Abam -- Amended Attorney Appearance (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #7 (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. by Ruddy S-A. Abam (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Credit One Bank N.A. by Christopher R Murphy (Murphy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauren Parker as to Credit One Bank N.A. on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022; Midland Credit Management Inc. on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 (Credit One Bank N.A.), #2 Summons Returned Executed (Midland Credit Management Inc._, #3 USM-285) (Midland Credit Management Inc.) (jmk, ) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Lauren Parker (bg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued along with USM 285 (forms, certified copy of order dated 4/6/2022 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendants Credit One Bank N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Midland Credit Management Inc., TransUnion LLC (bg, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT filed by Lauren Parker (Exhibit)(bg, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and directs the Clerk to issue summonses for Defendants TransUnion LLC; Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; Equifax Information Services LLC; Credit One Bank N.A.; and Midland Credit Management Inc. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve summons. Plaintiff shall complete a USM-285 form for each Defendant being served, if she has not already done so. Plaintiff shall file a status report by 5/20/22 concerning service. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Plaintiff Lauren Parker. (lma, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lma, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lauren Parker for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lma, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint by Lauren Parker (Exhibit) (lma, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit One Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant