This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 12:07:02 (UTC).

Parker v. Stirling et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Parker filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Stirling. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kaymani D West and Terry L Wooten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00938

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kaymani D West

Presiding Judge

Terry L Wooten

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodney Parker

Mccormick, SC 29899

Defendants

Jane Doe 10

Charles Williams

Thiery Nettles

Jane Doe 3

Jane Doe 6

John Doe 8

Bryan P Stirling

Jane Doe 11

Fred Thompson

Jane Doe 4

John Doe 7

Jane Doe 7

Joseph McFadden

John Doe 11

Jane Doe 5

Jane Doe 8

John Doe 6

John Doe 3

Scott Lewis

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel R Settana, Jr

Attorney at McKay Cauthen Settana and Stubley

1303 Blanding Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Ronald Keith Taylor, Jr

Attorney at McKay Law Firm

Po Box 7217

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 10, John Doe 10, Jane Doe 11, John Doe 11, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, John Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, John Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, John Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, John Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, John Doe 7, Jane Doe 8, John Doe 8, Jane Doe 9, John Doe 9, Kennard Dubose, David Dunlap, Scott Lewis, Joseph McFadden, Thiery Nettles, Thomas Robertson, Michael Stephen, Bryan P Stirling, Fred Thompson, Charles Williams, filed by Rodney Parker. Service due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#2

(#12) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #11 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/1/2019.(prou, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#11

(#13) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #11 Proper Form Order w/NEF, 12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, one Summons form, and nine USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail to Rodney Parker, #315646, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

15 #1

Envelope

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodney Parker from Rodney Parker, #315646, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899 **TO** Rodney Parker, #315646, Kershaw Correctional Institution, 4848 Goldmine Hwy, Kershaw, SC 29067. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER authorizing service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/22/2019. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#20

(#20) Summons Issued as to Kennard Dubose, David Dunlap, Scott Lewis, Joseph McFadden, Thiery Nettles, Thomas Robertson, Michael Stephen, Bryan P Stirling, Fred Thompson, Charles Williams. Service due by 7/22/2019. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#43

RESTRICTED

42 #1

Certificate of Service

#42

(#42) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Charles Williams. Charles Williams served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Ronald). Modified on 7/8/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

37 #2

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

#37

(#37) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by David Dunlap, Fred Thompson. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of R. Keith Taylor, Jr., #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Taylor, Ronald) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

37 #1

Affidavit Declaration of R. Keith Taylor, Jr.

36 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#36

(#36) USM-285 Returned Executed. Fred Thompson served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(prou, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

35 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#35

(#35) USM-285 Returned Executed. David Dunlap served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(prou, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) USM-285 Returned Unexecuted (Restricted Access) as to Thiery Nettles. (prou, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Charles Williams. Charles Williams served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Ronald). Modified on 7/8/2019 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (prou, ). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • (#41) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 40 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Rodney Parker, #315646, Kershaw Correctional Institution, 4848 Goldmine Hwy, Kershaw, SC 29067 (prou, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead submitted by Defendants Dunlap and Thompson, ECF No. #37 , is granted. Defendants Dunlap and Thompson now have until July 22, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. See ECF No. 33 regarding the response deadline for other served Defendants (Dubose, Lewis, McFadden, Robertson, Stephen, and Stirling). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/1/2019.(prou, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by David Dunlap, Fred Thompson. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of R. Keith Taylor, Jr., #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Taylor, Ronald) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) USM-285 Returned Executed. Fred Thompson served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(prou, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) USM-285 Returned Executed. David Dunlap served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(prou, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#34) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 33 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Rodney Parker, #315646, Kershaw Correctional Institution, 4848 Goldmine Hwy, Kershaw, SC 29067. (prou, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) TEXT ORDER: On June 24, 2019, Defendants filed a Motion for an Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. ECF No. #32 . Defendants state that they filed their Motion under Local Civil Rules 6.01 and 12.01, D.S.C., and request an extension of 21 days, or until July 17, 2019, to file their Answer or other response. Defendants provide the following reasons in support of their motion: Plaintiff has filed suit against 34 former and current employees of SCDC; service has not been effected on all named Defendants; Plaintiff has made allegations against 22 John and Jane Doe Defendants; Plaintiff's Complaint contains multiple legal issues, alleged incidents, and causes of action; and the alleged events underlying Plaintiff's claims were asserted to have taken place at five SCDC facilities over a three year period. Counsel for Defendants also state that they need to determine the roles that each Defendant played in the alleged incidents and that they need to evaluate potential conflicts. Defendants represent that the 21-day extension will not affect other deadlines and that no other parties will be prejudiced by the requested extension. Defendants' Motion for Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #32 , is granted. The deadline for Defendants' Answer or other response is now July 17, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/25/2019.(prou, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Kennard Dubose, Scott Lewis, Joseph McFadden, Thomas Robertson, Michael Stephen, Bryan P Stirling. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of R. Keith Taylor, Jr., #2 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Taylor, Ronald) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Summons Issued as to Kennard Dubose, David Dunlap, Scott Lewis, Joseph McFadden, Thiery Nettles, Thomas Robertson, Michael Stephen, Bryan P Stirling, Fred Thompson, Charles Williams. Service due by 7/22/2019. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER authorizing service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/22/2019. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodney Parker from Rodney Parker, #315646, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899 **TO** Rodney Parker, #315646, Kershaw Correctional Institution, 4848 Goldmine Hwy, Kershaw, SC 29067. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #11 Proper Form Order w/NEF, 12 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, one Summons form, and nine USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail to Rodney Parker, #315646, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #11 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/1/2019.(prou, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 4/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 4/1/2019. (prou, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#5) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenwood. (prou, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • (#4) Filing fee: $ 114.26, receipt number SCX300080990. (prou, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Rodney Parker. Response to Motion due by 4/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 10, John Doe 10, Jane Doe 11, John Doe 11, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, John Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, John Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, John Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, John Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, John Doe 7, Jane Doe 8, John Doe 8, Jane Doe 9, John Doe 9, Kennard Dubose, David Dunlap, Scott Lewis, Joseph McFadden, Thiery Nettles, Thomas Robertson, Michael Stephen, Bryan P Stirling, Fred Thompson, Charles Williams, filed by Rodney Parker. Service due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.