This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:15:18 (UTC).

PARKER v. SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 PARKER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04346

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMETRIUS PARKER

Defendants

MR. DAWSON

HANIF JACKSON

SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC.

DARLENE GREEN

LAUREL SHOVLIN

CITY OF PHILADELPHIA

CAROLE

RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC.

RIVERVIEW PERSONAL CARE HOME

RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. doing business as FERNWOOD SHELTER PHILADELPHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CATHERINE W. SMITH

Attorney at DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP

1835 Market St Suite 2950

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SUSAN C. KEESLER

Attorney at DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP PLLC

1835 Market St Suite 2950

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

JO BENNETT

Attorney at SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS LLP

1600 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. LAUREL SHOVLIN waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (KEESLER, SUSAN) Modified on 11/7/2019 (fb). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (KEESLER, SUSAN) Modified on 11/7/2019 (fb). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE) Modified on 10/15/2019 (fb). (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. HANIF JACKSON waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE) Modified on 10/15/2019 (fb). (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN C. KEESLER on behalf of DEMETRIUS PARKER (KEESLER, SUSAN) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC..(BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JO BENNETT on behalf of HANIF JACKSON, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. (BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CAROLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DAWSON, DARLENE GREEN, HANIF JACKSON, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC., RIVERVIEW PERSONAL CARE HOME, SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC., LAUREL SHOVLIN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203952.), filed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. LAUREL SHOVLIN waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (KEESLER, SUSAN) Modified on 11/7/2019 (fb). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (KEESLER, SUSAN) Modified on 11/7/2019 (fb). (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE) Modified on 10/15/2019 (fb). (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. HANIF JACKSON waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE) Modified on 10/15/2019 (fb). (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN C. KEESLER on behalf of DEMETRIUS PARKER (KEESLER, SUSAN) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC..(BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JO BENNETT on behalf of HANIF JACKSON, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. (BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DEMETRIUS PARKER. (ahf) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Summons Issued as to CAROLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DAWSON, DARLENE GREEN, HANIF JACKSON, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC., RIVERVIEW PERSONAL CARE HOME, SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC., LAUREL SHOVLIN. 10 Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/20/2019 (ahf) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CAROLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DAWSON, DARLENE GREEN, HANIF JACKSON, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC., RIVERVIEW PERSONAL CARE HOME, SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC., LAUREL SHOVLIN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203952.), filed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUSAN C. KEESLER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATHERINE W. SMITH