This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 08:17:05 (UTC).

Parker v. Pearsal et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Parker filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Pearsal. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James P. Mazzone, Frederick P. Stamp, Jr and John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00303

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James P. Mazzone

Presiding Judges

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert D. Parker

Pollock, LA 71467

Defendants

RN Hileman

RN Pearsal

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CHANGE THE CAUSE OF ACTION: an initial partial filing fee of $31.17 shall be forwarded to the Financial Deputy Clerk. The Clerk is also directed to change the Cause of Action from 41:1983 Civil Rights to 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/2/2019. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr; copy to FDC and TC w/Consent to Collection via us mail) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER TO FILE PROPERLY COMPLETED PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT AND CURRENT LEDGER SHEETS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/14/2019. (nmm) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/7/2019. (nmm) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

6 #2

PTAR

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) ORDER TO FILE PROPERLY COMPLETED PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT AND CURRENT LEDGER SHEETS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/5/2019. (copy to pro se plaintiff w/PTAR via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #2 PTAR) (nmm). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

5 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via cm,rrr; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #5

Cover letter

1 #4

Administrative Remedy docs

1 #3

Exhibit 2A (medical record)

1 #2

Exhibit 1A-1B (medical records)

1 #1

Attachment I and II (Statement of Claim)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • (#11) Case Reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey per Order entered in 3:20MC1. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. There are no hearings scheduled before the District Judge to be reset at this time.Copy of NEF and MC Order to pro se party by regular mail. (cmd) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CHANGE THE CAUSE OF ACTION: an initial partial filing fee of $31.17 shall be forwarded to the Financial Deputy Clerk. The Clerk is also directed to change the Cause of Action from 41:1983 Civil Rights to 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/2/2019. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr; copy to FDC and TC w/Consent to Collection via us mail) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER TO FILE PROPERLY COMPLETED PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT AND CURRENT LEDGER SHEETS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/14/2019. (nmm) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/7/2019. (nmm) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO FILE PROPERLY COMPLETED PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT AND CURRENT LEDGER SHEETS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/5/2019. (copy to pro se plaintiff w/PTAR via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #2 PTAR) (nmm). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via cm,rrr; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment III and IIII; 2B-C(letter re: ledger sheets), #2 Exhibit 2B - Notice re: lockdown, #3 Exhibit X Y Z "Trust Fund Deposit" docs, #4 Cover letter, #5 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert D. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment I and II (Statement of Claim), #2 Exhibit 1A-1B (medical records)(SEALED), #3 Exhibit 2A (medical record) (SEALED), #4 Administrative Remedy docs, #5 Cover letter, #6 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) Modified on 11/5/2019 to Seal attachments per Judge Stamp (nmm). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.