This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2019 at 07:39:44 (UTC).

Parker v. National Association of Letter Carriers et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Parker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against National Association of Letter Carriers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Steven Whalen, Marianne O. Battani, Anthony P. Patti and David M. Lawson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12915

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judges

R. Steven Whalen

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judges

Marianne O. Battani

David M. Lawson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacey Parker

Defendants

National Association of Letter Carriers, Patrick D. Carroll

Megan J. Brennan

National Association of Letter Carriers

United States Postal Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michelle E. Vocht

Attorney at Roy, Shecter & Vocht, P.C.

707 S. Eton St.

Birmingham, MI 48009

Lynn H. Shecter

Attorney at Roy, Shecter, and Vocht, P.C.

707 South Eton Street

Birmingham, MI 48009

Defendant Attorneys

Peter D. DeChiara

Attorney at Cohen, Weiss,

330 W. 42Nd Street, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-6901

Kate M. Swearengen

Attorney at Cohen Weiss and Simon LLP

330 W. 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10036

John G. Adam

Attorney at Legghio & Israel. P.C.

306 S. Washington, Suite 600

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Stuart M. Israel

Attorney at Legghio & Israel, P.C.

306 S. Washington, Suite 600

Royal Oak, MI 48067

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Exhibit Return Card US Atty General

11 #2

Exhibit USPS Return Card

#12

12 #1

Index of Exhibits Registered mail Return Card

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. United States Postmaster served on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Registered mail Return Card) (Vocht, Michelle) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of United States Postal Service served on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Card US Atty General, #2 Exhibit USPS Return Card) (Vocht, Michelle) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Marianne O. Battani and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen to District Judge David M. Lawson and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Stacey Parker against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Vocht, Michelle) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kate M. Swearengen on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers, National Association of Letter Carriers, Patrick D. Carroll. (Swearengen, Kate) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D. DeChiara on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers, National Association of Letter Carriers, Patrick D. Carroll. (DeChiara, Peter) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn H. Shecter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Shecter, Lynn) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John G. Adam appearing on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers, National Association of Letter Carriers, Patrick D. Carroll (Adam, John) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stuart M. Israel appearing on behalf of National Association of Letter Carriers, National Association of Letter Carriers, Patrick D. Carroll (Israel, Stuart) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DAll) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Megan J. Brennan, National Association of Letter Carriers, National Association of Letter Carriers, Patrick D. Carroll, United States Postal Service* (DAll) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Stacey Parker against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7433327 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: MIED, 2:19-cv-12178, Judge David M. Lawson] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Vocht, Michelle) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Association of Letter Carriers is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn H. Shecter