This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2021 at 08:40:24 (UTC).

Parker v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 Parker filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00314

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheldon Parker

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Mountain Run Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank H. Kerney, III

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

One Tampa City Center Ste 700, 201 N Franklin Street

Tampa, FL 33602-5157

Defendant Attorney

Maria Helena Ruiz

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP - Miami

Suite 1420, 1441 Brickell Ave

Miami, FL 33131-3426

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSet/reset scheduling order deadlines: Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/11/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/10/2022. (RLK) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/26/2022; Dispositive motions due by 9/9/2022; Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, JANUARY 12, 2023, at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Jury Trial set on the FEBRUARY 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody, Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/9/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 8/3/2021. (KAC) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #7 Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on 06/15/2021 by Sheldon Parker as to Mountain Run Solutions LLC. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 06/15/2021 by Sheldon Parker as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Mountain Run Solutions LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Sheldon Parker. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Sheldon Parker.(Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sheldon Parker. (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sheldon Parker. Related case(s): No (Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Mountain Run Solutions LLC. (LAB) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-0314-JSM-PRL. (SJB) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Mountain Run Solutions LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18341441) filed by Sheldon Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Kerney, Frank) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mountain Run Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank H. Kerney, III