Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 10:13:29 (UTC).

Parker v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Parker filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden, John C. Gargiulo and Taylor B. McNeel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

Presiding Judges

Halil S. Ozerden

Taylor B. McNeel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis R Parker

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arati C Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Kelly Chermack - PHV

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

David W. Shelton

Attorney at DAVID SHELTON, ATTORNEY AT LAW

P. O. Box 2541

Oxford, MS 38655

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC - Atlanta, GA

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

J. Carter Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN, CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, PC - Jackson

One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Drive, Suite 400, P. O. Box 14167 (39236-4167)

Jackson, MS 39211

Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP - Austin

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dennis R Parker (Shelton, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

13 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

13 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#13

(#13) MOTION for Kelly Chermack to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4517893) by Dennis R Parker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shelton, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Shelton on behalf of Dennis R Parker (Shelton, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#8

TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Richard North, Jr. is terminated as counsel of record for the Defendants. Elizabeth Ross Hadley is substituted as counsel of record for the Defendants. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/4/2021 (AG) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Letter sent to Arati Furness, Matthew Ryan McCarley, and Richard B. North on February 26, 2021, requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PKS) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#3

(#3) *AMENDED By doc. 6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16986136 filed by Dennis R Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines. The parties have indicated that they are attempting to finalize a settlement. The deadline to submit a proposed Final Judgment to Judge McNeel's chambers, file a Stipulation of Dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared, or advise the Court that they consent to entry of the Court's standard Final Judgment is 7/5/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/5/2021 (AG) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelly Chermack. Kelly Chermack is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/30/2021 (AB) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys Following Transfer. Arati C. Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley are terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/30/2021 (AG) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dennis R Parker (Shelton, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Kelly Chermack to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4517893) by Dennis R Parker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shelton, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Shelton on behalf of Dennis R Parker (Shelton, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketParties should use the newly assigned Judge's initials on future filings: 1:21cv48TBM-JCG. (wld) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Richard North, Jr. is terminated as counsel of record for the Defendants. Elizabeth Ross Hadley is substituted as counsel of record for the Defendants. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/4/2021 (AG) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Defs' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter sent to Arati Furness, Matthew Ryan McCarley, and Richard B. North on February 26, 2021, requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (PKS) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04299. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED By doc. 6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-4299-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16986136 filed by Dennis R Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Shelton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly Chermack