This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2020 at 13:51:48 (UTC).

Parker v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 Parker filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are David T. Schultz and Joan N. Ericksen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01280

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

Presiding Judge

Joan N. Ericksen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marne Parker

Defendants

Arizant Healthcare, Inc.

3M Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Genevieve M Zimmerman

Attorney at Meshbesher & Spence

1616 Park Avenue

Mpls, MN 55404

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin W Hulse

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 6/4/2020.(CBC) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marne Parker. 3M Company served on 5/31/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Arizant Healthcare, Inc. served on 5/31/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 05/31/2020)

#5

(#5) MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1 Establishing Procedures Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(MKB) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MKB) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7760867) filed by Marne Parker. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 6/4/2020.(CBC) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marne Parker. 3M Company served on 5/31/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Arizant Healthcare, Inc. served on 5/31/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 05/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1 Establishing Procedures Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(MKB) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2666 (JNE/DTS). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2666-JNE-DTS. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair Hugger MDL website at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Bair-Hugger/index.shtml. (MKB) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MKB) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1280 (JNE/DTS). (MKB) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7760867) filed by Marne Parker. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less