Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2021 at 10:55:31 (UTC).

Parker et al v. Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 Parker filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-03553

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patrice Parker

Michael T. Parker

Defendants

Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc.

Ocean 18, LLC

FCI Lender Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip R Robinson

Attorney at Consumer Law Center LLC

Suite 308, 8737 Colesville Road

Silver Spring, MD 20910

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Francis Maloney

Attorney at Joseph Greenwald and Laake PA

6404 Ivy Ln Ste 400

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Alyse Lauren Prawde

Attorney at Joseph, Greenwald & Laake

6404 Ivy Lane, Suite 400

Greenbelt, MD 20770

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/22/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION for Settlement Order- Rule 111 by FCI Lender Services, Inc., Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc., Ocean 18, LLC(Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#11

(#11) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by FCI Lender Services, Inc. (Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#10

(#10) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ocean 18, LLC (Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc. (Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#7

(#7) Correspondence re: Letter Requesting Leave of the Court to Move to Remand this Action back to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County (Robinson, Phillip) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#6

(#6) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/8/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, filing Civil Cover Sheet (Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

1 #10

Attachment Writ of Summons - Ocean 18 LLC

1 #9

Attachment Writ of Summons - Nationwide Servicing Center

1 #8

Attachment Writ of Summons - FCI

1 #7

Attachment State Court Scheduling Order - Track 3

1 #5

Attachment Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference

1 #4

Attachment Notice of New Case Number

1 #3

Attachment Administrative Notice

1 #2

Attachment State Court Complaint

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 483903-V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-8999932), filed by Ocean 18, LLC, FCI Lender Services, Inc., Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Complaint, #3 Attachment Administrative Notice, #4 Attachment Notice of New Case Number, #5 Attachment Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference, #6 Attachment State Court Scheduling Notice, #7 Attachment State Court Scheduling Order - Track 3, #8 Attachment Writ of Summons - FCI, #9 Attachment Writ of Summons - Nationwide Servicing Center, #10 Attachment Writ of Summons - Ocean 18 LLC)(Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/22/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION for Settlement Order- Rule 111 by FCI Lender Services, Inc., Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc., Ocean 18, LLC(Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by FCI Lender Services, Inc. (Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ocean 18, LLC (Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc. (Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request for leave to file a motion to remand this action back to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County. Plaintiffs may file their motion on or before December 23, 2020, Defendants may respond on or before January 15, 2021, and Plaintiffs may reply on or before January 29, 2021. The parties are directed to make their briefs as concise as possible; the motion and opposition briefing shall not exceed 20 pages each unless otherwise approved by the Court (excluding exhibits, tables of contents, lists of cases, etc.), and the reply brief should be no longer than 10 pages. All exhibits shall have key language highlighted so the Court can readily determine the relevant information in the exhibit. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/8/2020. (imws, Chambers) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correspondence re: Letter Requesting Leave of the Court to Move to Remand this Action back to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County (Robinson, Phillip) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/8/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, filing Civil Cover Sheet (Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Ocean 18, LLC, FCI Lender Services, Inc., Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc. was filed incompletely. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Federal civil cover sheet. To correct this problem, file the civil cover sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link the civil cover sheet to #1 . (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDeficiency Notice -All Defendants- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/15/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/8/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against FCI Lender Services, Inc., Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc., Ocean 18, LLC, filed by Michael T. Parker, Patrice Parker.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 483903-V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-8999932), filed by Ocean 18, LLC, FCI Lender Services, Inc., Nationwide Servicing Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Complaint, #3 Attachment Administrative Notice, #4 Attachment Notice of New Case Number, #5 Attachment Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference, #6 Attachment State Court Scheduling Notice, #7 Attachment State Court Scheduling Order - Track 3, #8 Attachment Writ of Summons - FCI, #9 Attachment Writ of Summons - Nationwide Servicing Center, #10 Attachment Writ of Summons - Ocean 18 LLC)(Prawde, Alyse) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCI LENDER SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alyse Lauren Prawde