This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:34:26 (UTC).

Parker et al v. Jefferson County School District Board of Education

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Parker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jefferson County School District Board of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T Michael Putnam and Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00536

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

T Michael Putnam

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michele Parker

Barry Parker

Jeff Dockery

Tara Adaway

Elizabeth Willmon

Defendant

Jefferson County School District Board of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel J Schiller

Attorney at SCHILLER LAW FIRM

4113 Cumby Road, Suite 200

Cookeville, TN 38501

A Scott Hughes

Attorney at BLOUNT HUGHES

2030 B Gadsden Highway

Birmingham, AL 35235

Defendant Attorney

Carl E Johnson, Jr

Attorney at BISHOP COLVIN JOHNSON & KENT LLP

1910 First Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/10/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within. Discovery due by 4/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/10/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schiller, Samuel) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#10

(#10) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (KAM) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jefferson County School District Board of Education.(Johnson, Carl) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#6

(#6) Summonses (2) Issued as to Jefferson County School District Board of Education, returned to pltf (in SASE) for service (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel J Schiller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schiller, Samuel) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Motion is RIPE 4/5/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tara Adaway, Jeff Dockery, Barry Parker, Michele Parker, Elizabeth Willmon. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jefferson County School District Board of Education, filed by Michele Parker, Barry Parker, Elizabeth Willmon, Jeff Dockery, Tara Adaway.(MRR, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/10/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within. Discovery due by 4/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/10/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER. The scheduling conference now set for July 2, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby CANCELED. The court will issue a Scheduling Order based on the recently filed Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 07/01/2019. (Borden, Gray) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schiller, Samuel) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (KAM) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 7/2/2019, at 10:30 AM in chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/21/2019. (PMA) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jefferson County School District Board of Education.(Johnson, Carl) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summonses (2) Issued as to Jefferson County School District Board of Education, returned to pltf (in SASE) for service (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel J Schiller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schiller, Samuel) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/5/2019. (PMA) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3317559 (B4601096629). (Schiller, Samuel) Modified on 4/10/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3317552 (B4601096628). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson County School District Board of Education, filed by Michele Parker, Barry Parker, Elizabeth Willmon, Jeff Dockery, Tara Adaway.(MRR, ). (Schiller, Samuel) Modified on 4/10/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice Motion is RIPE 4/5/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tara Adaway, Jeff Dockery, Barry Parker, Michele Parker, Elizabeth Willmon. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jefferson County School District Board of Education, filed by Michele Parker, Barry Parker, Elizabeth Willmon, Jeff Dockery, Tara Adaway.(MRR, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.