This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2020 at 07:16:58 (UTC).

Park Place Hospitality, LLC v. Continental Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Park Place Hospitality, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Continental Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06403

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Park Place Hospitality, LLC

Defendant

Continental Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Szot

Attorney at Miller Law LLC

2910, 115 S Lasalle Street, Suite 2910

Chicago, IL 60603

Marvin Alan Miller

Attorney at Miller Law LLC

115 South Lasalle Street, Suite 2910

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 1/4/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/28/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Park Place Hospitality, LLC by Andrew Szot (Szot, Andrew) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Park Place Hospitality, LLC by Marvin Alan Miller (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Park Place Hospitality, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17589176. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Continental Insurance Company (ke, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 1/4/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/28/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Park Place Hospitality, LLC by Andrew Szot (Szot, Andrew) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Park Place Hospitality, LLC by Marvin Alan Miller (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Park Place Hospitality, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17589176. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less