This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2019 at 07:04:09 (UTC).

Park Miller, LLC et al v. Durham Group, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Park Miller, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Durham Group, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-04185

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marcia Lawson

James Combs

Dorothy Combs

Lawson Land, Inc.

Suzanne B. Combs

Park Miller, LLC

Henry S Lawson

Edward Miner

Gregory M. Combs

Defendants

Craig McGrain

First Austin Funding Corp.

Durham Group, Ltd.

Maasai Holdings LLC

Durham Commercial Capital Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard T. Bowles

Attorney at Bowles & Verna LLP

2121 N. California Boulevard, Suite 875

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Alexandrea Marie Tomp

Attorney at Bowles and Verna

2121 N. California Blvd., Suite 875

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorney

June D. Coleman

Attorney at Carlson & Messer LLP

5901 West Century Bl. Suite #1200, Los Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by June D. Coleman (Coleman, June) (Filed on 9/4/2019) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Henry S Lawson, Marcia Lawson, Lawson Land, Inc., Edward Miner, Park Miller, LLC. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner re #1 Complaint, , WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner. Service waived by Craig McGrain waiver sent on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, James Combs, Suzanne B. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Marcia Lawson, Lawson Land, Inc., Edward Miner, Park Miller, LLC (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/12/2019) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Durham Commercial Capital Corp., Durham Group, Ltd., First Austin Funding Corp., Maasai Holdings LLC, Craig McGrain. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, James Combs, Suzanne B. Combs, Henry S Lawson.. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Durham Commercial Capital Corp., Durham Group, Ltd., First Austin Funding Corp., Maasai Holdings LLC, Craig McGrain (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13538318). Filed by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/19/2019) Modified on 7/22/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by June D. Coleman (Coleman, June) (Filed on 9/4/2019) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Henry S Lawson, Marcia Lawson, Lawson Land, Inc., Edward Miner, Park Miller, LLC. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner re #1 Complaint, , WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner. Service waived by Craig McGrain waiver sent on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, James Combs, Suzanne B. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Marcia Lawson, Lawson Land, Inc., Edward Miner, Park Miller, LLC (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 8/12/2019) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Durham Commercial Capital Corp., Durham Group, Ltd., First Austin Funding Corp., Maasai Holdings LLC, Craig McGrain. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, James Combs, Suzanne B. Combs, Henry S Lawson.. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Durham Commercial Capital Corp., Durham Group, Ltd., First Austin Funding Corp., Maasai Holdings LLC, Craig McGrain (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13538318). Filed by James Combs, Marcia Lawson, Dorothy Combs, Gregory M. Combs, Henry S Lawson, Suzanne B. Combs, Lawson Land, Inc., Park Miller, LLC, Edward Miner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 7/19/2019) Modified on 7/22/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Durham Commercial Capital Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer June D. Coleman