This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2020 at 08:39:28 (UTC).

Park Lane-Reno Partners, LLC v. Syufy Enterprises

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Park Lane-Reno Partners, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Syufy Enterprises. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and Carla Baldwin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00596

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

Carla Baldwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Park Lane-Reno Partners, LLC

Defendant

Syufy Enterprises

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark G Simons

Attorney at SIMONS HALL JOHNSTON PC

6490 S. Mccarran Blvd., Suite F-46

Reno, NV 89509-6165

Jonathan A McGuire

Attorney at Simons Hall Johnston PC

6490 S. Mccarran Blvd., Ste. F-46

Reno, NV 89509

Defendant Attorneys

Janine C Prupas

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.

50 West Liberty Street, Suite 510

Reno, NV 89501

William E. Peterson

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.

50 West Liberty Street, Suite 510

Reno, NV 89501

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER - This action is remanded because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand (ECF No. #9 ) is denied as moot. Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) (A certified copy of the docket sheet was mailed to Second Judicial District Court on 11/3/2020). Modified on 11/3/2020: a certified copy of this Order was also mailed to Second Judicial on 11/3/2020 (AB). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Syufy Enterprises. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/17/2020.(Prupas, Janine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#9

(#9) EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Park Lane-Reno Partners, LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2020. (Simons, Mark) Modified on 10/30/2020 add emergency (WJ). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to #7 Order,, by Defendant Syufy Enterprises. (Prupas, Janine) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER - Defendant must show cause why the Court should not remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant is permitted to supplement its statement regarding removal (ECF No. #1 ) with a document that identifies the state citizenships of each member of Plaintiff Park Lane-Reno Partners, LLC, along with Defendant Syufy Enterprises, LP. Defendant must file the supplement within 10 days of the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendant's supplement within five days of Defendant's filing. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/7/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #4 Certificate of Interested Parties, by Defendant Syufy Enterprises. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Prupas, Janine) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Syufy Enterprises that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Century Theatres, Inc., Other Affiliate Cinemark USA, Other Affiliate Cinemark Holdings for Syufy Enterprises added. (Prupas, Janine) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit cont'd exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit cont'd exhibit A

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV20-01615, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6223548) by SYUFY ENTERPRISES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit cont'd exhibit A, #3 Exhibit cont'd exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Prupas, Janine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - This action is remanded because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand (ECF No. #9 ) is denied as moot. Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) (A certified copy of the docket sheet was mailed to Second Judicial District Court on 11/3/2020). Modified on 11/3/2020: a certified copy of this Order was also mailed to Second Judicial on 11/3/2020 (AB). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Syufy Enterprises. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/17/2020.(Prupas, Janine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Park Lane-Reno Partners, LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2020. (Simons, Mark) Modified on 10/30/2020 add emergency (WJ). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #7 Order,, by Defendant Syufy Enterprises. (Prupas, Janine) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER - Defendant must show cause why the Court should not remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant is permitted to supplement its statement regarding removal (ECF No. #1 ) with a document that identifies the state citizenships of each member of Plaintiff Park Lane-Reno Partners, LLC, along with Defendant Syufy Enterprises, LP. Defendant must file the supplement within 10 days of the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendant's supplement within five days of Defendant's filing. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/7/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #4 Certificate of Interested Parties, by Defendant Syufy Enterprises. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Prupas, Janine) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Syufy Enterprises that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Century Theatres, Inc., Other Affiliate Cinemark USA, Other Affiliate Cinemark Holdings for Syufy Enterprises added. (Prupas, Janine) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/22/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Counsel are reminded that LR 81-1 provides that "[a]ll pending motions and other requests directed to the state court are automatically denied without prejudice upon removal, and they may be refiled in this court." Any refiled requests must comply with LR 81-1. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV20-01615, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6223548) by SYUFY ENTERPRISES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit cont'd exhibit A, #3 Exhibit cont'd exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Prupas, Janine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark G. Simons Esquire