This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:23:39 (UTC).

Park et al v. Song et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Park filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Song. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00077

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Yu

Andrew Chang

Paul Lee

Stephen Park

Korilla BBQ LLC.

Defendants

Aegis 42, LLC

Esther Choi

Aegis 233, LLC,

3E LLC

Let Group, LLC,

Koast LLC

Kommissary LLC

White Tiger Named Korilla, LLC

Byung Keun Song

Hardy Chung

Grand Koast LLC

David Im

Edward Song

Korilla East Village Truck, Inc.

John Doe 1-10

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Meyer Y. Silber

Attorney at The Silber Law Firm, LLC

11 Broadway, Suite 715

New York, NY 10004

Samuel Goldman

Attorney at Samuel Goldman & Associates

200 Park Avenue, Suite 1700

New York, NY 10166

Defendant Attorney

Lawrence F. Morrison

Attorney at Morrison Tenenbaum PLLC

87 Walker Street, Floor 2

New York, NY 10013

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Retain Venue by Aegis 42, LLC (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Summons with Notice

1 #3

Exhibit Amended Complaint

#11

(#11) Notice of Civil Case Referral/Transfer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#9

(#9) First MOTION to Refer/Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Aegis 42, LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to motion of Defendant Aegis 42, LLC to refer this action to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District filed by All Plaintiffs. (Goldman, Samuel) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aegis 42, LLC from New York Supreme Court- County of New York, case number 650186/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12218980) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Suggestion of Bankruptcy) (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Letter MOTION to Change Venue Re Request for Referral to United States District Court Southern District of New York by Aegis 42, LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re #6 Stipulation Corrected to Provide that Consent to Waive Venue Defect is also Without Prejudice to Plaintiff's right to seek Remand of Action to the State Court by Aegis 42, LLC (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#12

(#12) Letter MOTION for Reconsideration and reverse the Court's 2/21/2020 decision by Andrew Chang, Paul Lee, Stephen Park, Thomas Yang, Eric Yu. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Suggestion of Bankruptcy

#8

(#8) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Andrew Chang, Paul Lee, Stephen Park, Thomas Yang, Eric Yu. (Goldman, Samuel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Aegis 42, LLC (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Letter MOTION for Reconsideration and reverse the Court's 2/21/2020 decision by Andrew Chang, Paul Lee, Stephen Park, Thomas Yang, Eric Yu. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Civil Case Referral/Transfer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER denying #8 motion to remand to state court and granting #9 motion to refer the case to bankruptcy court. This Court's jurisdiction exists, at least, on the basis of plaintiff's asserted Lanham Act claim. See 15 U.S.C. 1114; Parmalat Capital Fin. Ltd. v. Bank of Am. Corp., 639 F.3d 572, 579-80 (2d Cir. 2011). Because this case is at least related to defendants' Chapter 11 filings, the Court refers it to the bankruptcy court for further proceedings. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/21/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to motion of Defendant Aegis 42, LLC to refer this action to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District filed by All Plaintiffs. (Goldman, Samuel) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First MOTION to Refer/Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Aegis 42, LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Andrew Chang, Paul Lee, Stephen Park, Thomas Yang, Eric Yu. (Goldman, Samuel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION re #6 Stipulation Corrected to Provide that Consent to Waive Venue Defect is also Without Prejudice to Plaintiff's right to seek Remand of Action to the State Court by Aegis 42, LLC (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Change Venue pursuant to stipulation #6 . Any party seeking to either (1) refer this action to the Bankruptcy Court; or (2) transfer this action to the SDNY as the most convenient venue shall file such motion by 2/11/20. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/4/2020. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION to Retain Venue by Aegis 42, LLC (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER deferring ruling on #5 . Aegis 42 is directed to contact all other parties to this action and attempt to agree upon a stipulation waiving the improper venue so that the case can remain in this district. If the Court transfers the case now to the Southern District of New York, it seems certain, based on the notice of removal, that Aegis 42 LLC will then ask the S.D.N.Y. to transfer it back here under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) or 1412 so that it could be referred to the E.D.N.Y. Bankruptcy Court. Removal to the wrong venue is a waivable defect and the parties should attempt to work it out, without prejudice to plaintiffs' rights to oppose removal or referral to the E.D.N.Y. Bankruptcy Court. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/10/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter MOTION to Change Venue Re Request for Referral to United States District Court Southern District of New York by Aegis 42, LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Aegis 42 has removed this case to the wrong district. Section 1452 of Title 28 requires removal to the district where the state court action is pending. The state court action is pending in the New York County Supreme Court, which is within the Southern District of New York. The Court recognizes that the removal statute may be inefficient in this way, but the Court does not see how it can ignore the plain language of the statute. Aegis 42 is therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 1/17/20 why this case should not be remanded to the New York County Supreme Court or transferred to the Southern District of New York. Show Cause Response due by 1/17/2020.Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/10/2020. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Aegis 42, LLC (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aegis 42, LLC from New York Supreme Court- County of New York, case number 650186/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12218980) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Suggestion of Bankruptcy) (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.