Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 11:05:05 (UTC).

Parisienne v. Alpha Media LLC

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Parisienne filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Alpha Media LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anna J. Brown and Youlee Yim You. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00660

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Anna J. Brown

Youlee Yim You

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theodore Parisienne

Defendant

Alpha Media LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael O. Stevens

Attorney at Stevens & Legal LLC

3699 Ne John Olsen Avenue

Hillsboro, OR 97124

Defendant Attorneys

Susan D. Marmaduke

Attorney at Harrang Long Gary Rudnick, PC

1001 Sw Fifth Avenue, 16Th Floor

Portland, OR 97204-1116

Floyd Brantley Chapman

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Floyd Brantley Chapman for Alpha Media LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5891832 issued. Signed on 6/24/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#11

(#11) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Floyd Brantley Chapman . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5891832. Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Alpha Media LLC. Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#7

(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Extension of Deadlines in Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order Complaint, #1 . Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (eo) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#4

(#4) Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (ecp) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Alpha Media LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 9/27/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

1 #5

Copyright Report

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5831909 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 2-013-887--Parisienne_Daryl Campbell2, 1:17:17--Theodore Parisienne. Filed by Theodore Parisienne against Alpha Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Copyright Report). (Stevens, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • (#14) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Floyd Brantley Chapman (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: fbchapman. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Floyd Brantley Chapman for Alpha Media LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5891832 issued. Signed on 6/24/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#12) Scheduling Order: At the request of Counsel, the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for 6/25/2019 at 10:30am is STRICKEN. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Floyd Brantley Chapman . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5891832. Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • (#10) Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, 6/25/2019 at 10:30AM (by telephone) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Defendant Alpha Media LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 8/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Alpha Media LLC. Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Extension of Deadlines in Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order Complaint, #1 . Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (eo) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Register of Copyrights regarding Copyright Report, #4 . (ecp) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (ecp) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Alpha Media LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 9/27/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5831909 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 2-013-887--Parisienne_Daryl Campbell2, 1:17:17--Theodore Parisienne. Filed by Theodore Parisienne against Alpha Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Copyright Report). (Stevens, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less