This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:54:49 (UTC).

Parimal v. Manitex International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Parimal filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Manitex International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael P. Shea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01910

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parimal

Defendant

Manitex International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian D. Rich

Attorney at Halloran & Sage

One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.

Hartford, CT 06103

Defendant Attorney

Noah M Weissman

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint Until After Decision On Manitex's Partial Motion To Dismiss #1 Complaint by Manitex International, Inc.. (Weissman, Noah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#11

(#11) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parimal. Manitex International, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 3, 2020 To Respond To Complaint #1 Complaint by Manitex International, Inc.. (Weissman, Noah) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Parimal re #1 Complaint (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Manitex International, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian D. Rich* *Halloran & Sage* *One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Parimal Signed by Clerk on 12/05/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/04/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/04/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2020. Discovery due by 6/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/04/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MANITEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5573877.), filed by PARIMAL.(Rich, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint Until After Decision On Manitex's Partial Motion To Dismiss #1 Complaint by Manitex International, Inc.. (Weissman, Noah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Manitex International, Inc. to 2/3/2020. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. The #8 consent motion for extension is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading will be due February 3, 2020.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/23/2019. (Karpman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parimal. Manitex International, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 3, 2020 To Respond To Complaint #1 Complaint by Manitex International, Inc.. (Weissman, Noah) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Parimal re #1 Complaint (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Manitex International, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian D. Rich* *Halloran & Sage* *One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Parimal Signed by Clerk on 12/05/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/04/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/04/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2020. Discovery due by 6/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/04/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketJudge Michael P. Shea added. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to MANITEX INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MANITEX INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5573877.), filed by PARIMAL.(Rich, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.