This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2022 at 09:27:58 (UTC).

Pariani v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Pariani filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Mead Johnson Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04115

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margurite Pariani

Defendants

Northbay Healthcare Group

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Abbott Laboratories

Northbay Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

M. Elizabeth Graham

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer PA

2325 3Rd Street, Suite 329

San Francisco, CA 94107

Alexandra M. Walsh

Attorney at Walsh Law PLLC

1050 Connecticut Avenue Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Neal C. Lutterman

Attorney at Wilke Fleury LLP

621 Capitol Mall, Suite 900

Sacramento, CA 95814

Jonathan Matthew Baum

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

1 Market St. #3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Celeste Marie Brecht

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) REMAND with certified copy of order dated 9/19/2022 and letter to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Solano. (jg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#34

(#34) AMENDED MDL REMAND CLOSING ORDER: The court's previous MDL remand closing order dated 8/31/2022 #32 is vacated. The court, in error, transferred this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order #31 , this case is remanded, forthwith, to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Solano, Case number FCS057968. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California, forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/19/2022. Mailed notice (jg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#33

(#33) TRANSFERRED to the USDC, Eastern District of California the electronic record. (jg, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#32

(#32) MDL Remand Closing Order of member case: Pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order #31 , this case is remanded to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California, forthwith. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/31/2022. Mailed notice (jg, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#31

(#31) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/29/2022. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#30

(#30) RESPONSE by Abbott Laboratories to MOTION by Plaintiff Margurite Pariani to remand PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RULE ON PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED REMAND MOTIONS FILED IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURTS FOR THE NORTHERN AND EASTERN DISTRICTS OF CALIFORNIA #27 (Parker, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#29

(#29) NOTICE by Margurite Pariani re MOTION by Plaintiff Margurite Pariani to remand PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RULE ON PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED REMAND MOTIONS FILED IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURTS FOR THE NORTHERN AND EASTERN DISTRICTS OF CALIFORNIA #27 (Walsh, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

28 #4

Exhibit D

#27

(#28) DECLARATION of Alexandra M. Walsh regarding motion to remand, #27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Walsh, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration of Celeste M. Brecht

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketMAILED a copy of order dated 9/19/2022 to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California. (jg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REMAND with certified copy of order dated 9/19/2022 and letter to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Solano. (jg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) AMENDED MDL REMAND CLOSING ORDER: The court's previous MDL remand closing order dated 8/31/2022 #32 is vacated. The court, in error, transferred this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order #31 , this case is remanded, forthwith, to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Solano, Case number FCS057968. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California, forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/19/2022. Mailed notice (jg, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Eastern District of California - Live System as case 2:22-cv-01546, filed 09/02/2022. (nsf, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) TRANSFERRED to the USDC, Eastern District of California the electronic record. (jg, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MDL Remand Closing Order of member case: Pursuant to the Memorandum Opinion and Order #31 , this case is remanded to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California, forthwith. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/31/2022. Mailed notice (jg, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/29/2022. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE by Abbott Laboratories to MOTION by Plaintiff Margurite Pariani to remand PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RULE ON PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED REMAND MOTIONS FILED IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURTS FOR THE NORTHERN AND EASTERN DISTRICTS OF CALIFORNIA #27 (Parker, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE by Margurite Pariani re MOTION by Plaintiff Margurite Pariani to remand PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RULE ON PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED REMAND MOTIONS FILED IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURTS FOR THE NORTHERN AND EASTERN DISTRICTS OF CALIFORNIA #27 (Walsh, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) DECLARATION of Alexandra M. Walsh regarding motion to remand, #27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Walsh, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION by Abbott Laboratories re #6 Motion to Stay. (Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of COMPLIANCE with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brecht, Celeste) Modified on 5/9/2022 (Huang, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to REMAND by Margurite Pariani. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Graham, M. Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Graham, M. Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to STAY by Abbott Laboratories. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brecht, Celeste) Modified on 4/29/2022 (Reader, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Celeste Brecht re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brecht, Celeste) Modified on 4/29/2022 (Reader, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Abbott Laboratories. (Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Abbott Laboratories. (Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number FCS057968 by Abbott Laboratories. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10202008)(Attachments: #1 Declaration of Celeste M. Brecht, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northbay Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where Northbay Hospital is a litigant