This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2022 at 07:39:28 (UTC).

Paredes v. Bronson et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 Paredes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bronson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Lehrburger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05450

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Lehrburger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mario Paredes

Defendants

Brian Bronson

Lily Transportation Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerard Ryan, III

Defendant Attorney

Keith Alan Raven

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerard Ryan, III on behalf of Mario Paredes..(Ryan, Gerard) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/30/2022) (ks) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp.. Document filed by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp., Mario Paredes. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/10/2022).(ks) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#10

(#10) JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Keith A. Raven dated August 24, 2022 re: Settlement. Document filed by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#11

(#11) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter filed by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp. ENDORSEMENT: The Court applauds the parties on having reached a resolution of this case. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned sine die. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by October 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 8/24/2022) (mml) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter filed by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp. ENDORSEMENT: The Court applauds the parties on having reached a resolution of this case. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned sine die. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by October 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 8/24/2022) (mml) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Keith A. Raven dated August 24, 2022 re: Settlement. Document filed by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The conference will be held telephonically. The parties are instructed to call (888) 398-2342 and enter access code 9543348. Counsel shall jointly complete and file Judge Lehrburger's [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which must be submitted in compliance with Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices no later than one week before the initial case management conference. If suitable for the case, the parties are encouraged to use Judge Lehrburger's model Joint Electronic Discovery Submission and Proposed Order. These forms are available on the SDNY website at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-robert-w-lehrburger. (rsh) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp., Mario Paredes. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/10/2022).(ks) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) PROPOSED CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp.. Document filed by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/30/2022) (ks) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Brian Bronson, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2022

DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2022

DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2022

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerard Ryan, III on behalf of Mario Paredes..(Ryan, Gerard) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 808209/2022E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26338236).Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp., Brian Bronson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint).(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less